Mills v. Dollar General Corporate Office
Plaintiff: Dawoo Mills
Defendant: Dollar General Corporate Office
Case Number: 3:2021cv00368
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Dollar General Corporate Office.(Harrison, Shannon)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dawoo Mills. Dollar General Corporate Office waiver sent on 7/2/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (NLT)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Documents Mailed to the Defendant by Dawoo Mills (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(KMW)
July 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons by Dawoo Mills (KMW)
July 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Pro-Se E-Service & E-Notice Consent Form by Dawoo Mills (KMW)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dollar General Corporate Office. (Summons handed to pro se plaintiff at the front counter.) (EDC)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Submitted as to Dollar General Corporate Office. (EDC)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dollar General Corporate Office (Filing fee $ 402.) Receipt no. 4699031024, filed by Dawoo Mills. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 civil cover sheet, #3 summons)(EDC) Modified on 6/24/2021 to add payment information. (EDC).
June 24, 2021 ***Set CASE REFERRED Pro Se (non-inmate) Flag (EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Dollar General Corporate Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Corporate Office
Represented By: Trevor C Davies
Represented By: Maxwell C Hadley
Represented By: Shannon O'Neill Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawoo Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?