Spell et al v. Edwards et al
Plaintiff: Pastor Mark Anthony Spell, Life Tabernacle Church, Mark Anthony Spell and First Apostolic Church of East Baton Rouge Parish doing business as Life Tabernacle Church
Defendant: John Bell Edwards, Chief of Police Roger Corcoran, Sheriff Sid J Gautreaux, Roger Corcoran and Sid J Gautreaux
Case Number: 3:2021cv00423
Filed: July 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
2 Judge: Scott D Johnson
3 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE AND ORDER: Considering the [10, 11, 12] Motions to Dismiss filed by Richard Corcoran, Sid Gautreaux and John Bel Edwards, all of which raise the threshold issue of qualified immunity, IT IS ORDERED that discovery in this matter is stayed pending resolution of the Motions to Dismiss and the 9/30/21 scheduling conference is CANCELED. No status report is due at this time. "Fifth Circuit jurisprudence is clear that when a defendant asserts the defense of qualified immunity, a stay of discovery pending resolution of the defense is appropriate." Imani v. City of Baton Rouge, Civil Action 17-439, 2018 WL 2208221, at * 4 (M.D. La. May 14, 2018). A stay of discovery may also be imposed, in the Court's discretion, to resolve threshold issues, such as standing and immunity. Petrus v. Bowen, 833 F.2d 581, 585 (5th Cir. 1987). The parties shall file a joint motion for scheduling conference within fourteen (14) days of the last ruling on the pending Motions to Dismiss, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/13/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by John Bell Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Garner, James)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Case with 20-cv-282 by John Bell Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Garner, James)
August 13, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sid J Gautreaux. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Johnston, Tara)
August 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Roger Corcoran. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment ORDER)(Thomas, John)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for of Time to File Responsive Pleadings pursuant to Local Rule (7(a). Sid Gautreaux, in his individual capacity as Sheriff of East Baton Rouge, Louisiana responsive pleadings to the Plaintiffs' Petition for Permanent Injunction and Damages are due by August 13, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/2/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
July 30, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Sid J Gautreaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Johnston, Tara) Modified on 7/30/2021 to edit text (ELW).
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part #6 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings, filed by Defendant John Bel Edwards. The Motion seeks an extension of time to respond to the [1-5] Petition for Permanent Injunction and Damages that was originally filed in Louisiana state court. The Motion is granted only in part because, although the Motion states that it seeks an additional twenty-one days to respond (until 8/23/21), that proposed date is not actually twenty-one days from the date the Motion states the answer would otherwise be due (7/29/21). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 81(c), Edwards' responsive pleadings would otherwise be due by no later than 8/4/21 (twenty-one days after the 7/14/21 service date). Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(a), Edwards is entitled to a twenty-one day extension from that date, or until 8/25/21, in which to file responsive pleadings. Since the Motion expressly requests relief under LR 7(a), responsive pleadings of John Bel Edwards to the [1-5] Petition for Permanent Injunction and Damages are due 8/25/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 07/29/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
July 29, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Original Petition. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
July 28, 2021 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Original Petition by John Bell Edwards. (Garner, James)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2021 at 01:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 9/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/28/2021. (BLR)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings pursuant to Local Rule (7(a). Defendant, Roger Corcoran in his capacity as Chief of Police for the City of Central, is GRANTED an extension to August 13, 2021 to file responsive pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/27/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The matter 21-423-JWD-SDJ, Spell et al v. Edwards et al hereby reassigned from United States District Judge John W. deGravlles, United States Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson to United States District Judge Brian A. Jackson and United States Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles and Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/26/2021. (ELW)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Roger Corcoran. (Thomas, John)
July 27, 2021 Case Reassigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Judge John W. deGravelles, Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (ELW)
July 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Case Number C-706311. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BLAMDC-2321644), filed by John Bell Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, #4 Attachment List of Parties and Pleadings, #5 Attachment Petition, #6 Attachment Citation John Bel Edwards, #7 Attachment Citation Roger Corcoran, #8 Attachment Citation Sheriff Sid Gautreaux, #9 Attachment Motion for Extension of Time, #10 Attachment Request for Notice)(Garner, James) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/23/2021) (ELW). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/23/2021) (ELW). Modified on 7/23/2021 to correct filing sequence (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spell et al v. Edwards et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pastor Mark Anthony Spell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Life Tabernacle Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Anthony Spell
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Wittenbrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Apostolic Church of East Baton Rouge Parish doing business as Life Tabernacle Church
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Wittenbrink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bell Edwards
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Christopher T. Chocheles
Represented By: Darnell Bludworth
Represented By: Jack M. Weiss, III
Represented By: Joshua S. Force
Represented By: Matthew F. Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police Roger Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Sid J Gautreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Corcoran
Represented By: John Scott Thomas
Represented By: Sheri M. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid J Gautreaux
Represented By: Mary G. Erlingson
Represented By: Ashley Michelle Caruso
Represented By: Tara Lynn Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?