Brown v. Fulton
Plaintiff: Levelle D. Brown
Defendant: Steven P. Fulton, Vitor Marcio Rocha, Philips North America, LLC and Philips RS North America, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00438
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philips North America, LLC, Philips RS North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips Naamloze Venootschap for Philips North America, LLC, Philips RS North America, LLC. (Perrier, Guy)
September 24, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay by Philips North America, LLC, Philips RS North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A)(Perrier, Guy)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting in part #14 First Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint, filed by Defendants Steven P. Fulton and Vito Marcio Rocha. The motion does not establish good cause for the requested thirty day extension of time as required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6, however, a twenty-one day extension of time is warranted under Local Civil Rule 7(a). The time period will run from the date responsive pleadings would otherwise be due. Further extensions will only be granted by motion for good cause. Responsive pleadings for Defendant Steven P. Fulton due 9/15/2021. Responsive pleadings for Defendant Vito Marcio Rocha due 9/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 09/02/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
August 31, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #11 Amended Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
August 27, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #11 Amended Complaint by Steven P. Fulton, Vitor Marcio Rocha. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Breaux, Ralph)
August 24, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Levelle D. Brown. Philips North America, LLC waiver sent on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (EDC)
August 24, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Levelle D. Brown. Philips RS North America, LLC waiver sent on 8/23/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (EDC)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Vitor Marcio Rocha served on 8/5/2021, answer due 8/26/2021. (US Marshal, )
August 23, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Steven P. Fulton served on 8/4/2021, answer due 8/25/2021. (US Marshal, )
August 19, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steven P. Fulton, Vitor Marcio Rocha, Philips North America, LLC, Philips RS North America, LLC, filed by Levelle D. Brown.(NLT)
August 2, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Vitor Marcio Rocha. (NOTICE: Summons issued to USM for Service.) (LLH)
August 2, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Steven P. Fulton, Vitor Marcio Rocha, filed by Levelle D. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LLH)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case. (EDC)
July 30, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Steven P. Fulton. (NOTICE: Summons sent to the USM.) (NLT)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff(s) application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk shall file said complaint without prepayment of costs or security thereof and the Clerk is directed to issue process to the defendant(s). The U. S. Marshal Service shall serve the summons and complaint on the defendant(s) wherever found. Plaintiff(s) will be required to provide to the United States Marshal a completed U.S. Marshal Form 285 (attached) for each defendant to be served. The United States Marshal will not serve the defendant without a properly completed form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 7/29/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pro Se E-Service and E-Notice Consent Form by Levelle D. Brown. (EDC)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Levelle D. Brown. (EDC)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven P. Fulton, filed by Levelle D. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(EDC)
July 28, 2021 ***Set CASE REFERRED Pro Se (non-inmate) Flag (EDC)
July 28, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levelle D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven P. Fulton
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Represented By: Cory Thomas Stuart
Represented By: Kristopher Gould
Represented By: Micah J. Fincher
Represented By: Ralph Gerard Breaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitor Marcio Rocha
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Represented By: Cory Thomas Stuart
Represented By: Kristopher Gould
Represented By: Micah J. Fincher
Represented By: Ralph Gerard Breaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips North America, LLC
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips RS North America, LLC
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?