Lee et al v. D.R. Horton, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lindsey Lee, Wayne Ballard, Jr., Jennifer Ballard, Ronald Roberts, III, Kathryn Roberts, Zachary Russell, Lacey Russell, Luis Hinostroza, Tim Addison, II, Stacy Addison, Jonathan McMorris and Gilbert Bankston, III
Defendant: D.R. Horton, Inc., D.R. Horton, Inc. - Gulf Coast, Acadian Trace HOA, Inc., Livingston Parish Council, George Kurz, Jake Lambert, David Stanton, Austin Kinchen, Nicole Lato, Dawna Tully, Danielle Vado, Rafael Vado, Robert Bransett, Curneshia Skinner, Jon Jermaine Palmer, Kyle Burgan, Demerria Drake-Young, Kourtin Morrell, Janice Morgan, Phillip Davidson, Jr., Steven Scavo, Jr., Richard M. Adams, Joshua Serrano, Jennifer Gonzales, Dawn Smith and Ryan Smith
Case Number: 3:2021cv00442
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 MOTION to Substitute Pleading. The clerk of court is directed to replace R. Doc. 15 with R. Doc. 16-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/30/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 30, 2021 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Whitehead, Jack)
September 29, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #16 First MOTION to Substitute Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
September 28, 2021 Filing 16 First MOTION to Substitute Answer by Nicole Lato. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Corrective Document , #2 Proposed Pleading; Corrective Document)(Nader, James) Modified on 9/29/2021 to edit the text (NLT).
September 24, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Nicole Lato.(Nader, James)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings, filed by Defendants D.R. Horton, Inc.-Gulf Coast; D.R. Horton, Inc.; Acadian Trace HOA, Inc.; George Kurz; David Stanton; and Jake Lambert. Good cause is established based on the representation of the need to further confer with these Defendants and gather information necessary to file responsive pleadings to the Complaint, which is 147 pages with attachments. Further, there does not appear to be any prejudice to Plaintiffs as certain other defendants do not have responsive pleadings due until 10/25/2021. Responsive pleadings for Defendants D.R. Horton, Inc.-Gulf Coast; D.R. Horton, Inc.; Acadian Trace HOA, Inc.; George Kurz; David Stanton; and Jake Lambert due by November 1, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 09/24/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
September 23, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
September 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time Responsive Pleadings by Acadian Trace HOA, Inc., D.R. Horton, Inc., D.R. Horton, Inc. - Gulf Coast, George Kurz, Jake Lambert, David Stanton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Ball, Trenton)
September 10, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Livingston Parish Council. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Moody, Christopher)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zachary Russell, Lacey Russell, Ronald Roberts, III, Lindsey Lee, Wayne Ballard, Jr, Kathryn Roberts, Tim Addison, II, Jennifer Ballard, Stacy Addison, Gilbert Bankston, III, Luis Hinostroza, Jonathan McMorris. Richard M. Adams served on 8/22/2021, answer due 9/13/2021; Robert Bransett served on 8/15/2021, answer due 9/7/2021; Jennifer Gonzales served on 8/22/2021, answer due 9/13/2021; Austin Kinchen served on 8/22/2021, answer due 9/13/2021; Nicole Lato served on 8/15/2021, answer due 9/7/2021; Jon Jermaine Palmer served on 8/15/2021, answer due 9/7/2021; Steven Scavo, Jr served on 8/15/2021, answer due 9/7/2021; Joshua Serrano served on 8/15/2021, answer due 9/7/2021; Curneshia Skinner served on 8/15/2021, answer due 9/7/2021; Dawn Smith served on 8/15/2021, answer due 9/7/2021; Ryan Smith served on 8/15/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Whitehead, Jack)
August 25, 2021 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel: In light of the #9 Waiver of Service filed, the Scheduling Conference is reset for 12/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/2/2021.This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
August 24, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Zachary Russell, Lacey Russell, Ronald Roberts, III, Lindsey Lee, Wayne Ballard, Jr, Kathryn Roberts, Tim Addison, II, Jennifer Ballard, Stacy Addison, Gilbert Bankston, III, Luis Hinostroza, Jonathan McMorris. Livingston Parish Council waiver sent on 8/24/2021, answer due 10/25/2021. (Whitehead, Jack)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zachary Russell, Lacey Russell, Ronald Roberts, III, Lindsey Lee, Wayne Ballard, Jr, Kathryn Roberts, Tim Addison, II, Jennifer Ballard, Stacy Addison, Gilbert Bankston, III, Luis Hinostroza, Jonathan McMorris. Acadian Trace HOA, Inc. served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021; D.R. Horton, Inc. served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021; D.R. Horton, Inc. - Gulf Coast served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021; George Kurz served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021; Jake Lambert served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021; David Stanton served on 8/13/2021, answer due 9/3/2021. (Whitehead, Jack)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kyle Burgan. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Submitted as to Kyle Burgan (Whitehead, Jack)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
August 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Submitted as to Adams, et al (Whitehead, Jack)
August 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acadian Trace HOA, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2021 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 9/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/3/2021. (EDC)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2325686.), filed by Zachary Russell, Lacey Russell, Ronald Roberts, III, Lindsey Lee, Wayne Ballard, Jr, Kathryn Roberts, Tim Addison, II, Jennifer Ballard, Stacy Addison, Gilbert Bankston, III, Luis Hinostroza, Jonathan McMorris. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Attachment Summons)(Whitehead, Jack) (Attachment 10 replaced on 8/3/2021) (ELW). Modified on 8/3/2021 to flatten documents (ELW).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. D.R. Horton, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Lee
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Barient
Represented By: John-Ed Long Bishop
Represented By: Patrick Wayne Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Ballard, Jr.
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Barient
Represented By: John-Ed Long Bishop
Represented By: Patrick Wayne Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Ballard
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Barient
Represented By: John-Ed Long Bishop
Represented By: Patrick Wayne Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Roberts, III
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Barient
Represented By: John-Ed Long Bishop
Represented By: Patrick Wayne Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Roberts
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Barient
Represented By: John-Ed Long Bishop
Represented By: Patrick Wayne Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Russell
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Barient
Represented By: John-Ed Long Bishop
Represented By: Patrick Wayne Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacey Russell
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Barient
Represented By: John-Ed Long Bishop
Represented By: Patrick Wayne Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Hinostroza
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Barient
Represented By: John-Ed Long Bishop
Represented By: Patrick Wayne Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Addison, II
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Barient
Represented By: John-Ed Long Bishop
Represented By: Patrick Wayne Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Addison
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Barient
Represented By: John-Ed Long Bishop
Represented By: Patrick Wayne Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan McMorris
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Barient
Represented By: John-Ed Long Bishop
Represented By: Patrick Wayne Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Bankston, III
Represented By: Jack K. Whitehead, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Barient
Represented By: John-Ed Long Bishop
Represented By: Patrick Wayne Pendley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.R. Horton, Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Laperouse, II
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Marcantel
Represented By: Trenton Christopher Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.R. Horton, Inc. - Gulf Coast
Represented By: Edward J. Laperouse, II
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Marcantel
Represented By: Trenton Christopher Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acadian Trace HOA, Inc.
Represented By: Edward J. Laperouse, II
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Marcantel
Represented By: Trenton Christopher Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Livingston Parish Council
Represented By: Christopher M. Moody
Represented By: Albert David Giraud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Kurz
Represented By: Edward J. Laperouse, II
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Marcantel
Represented By: Trenton Christopher Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Lambert
Represented By: Edward J. Laperouse, II
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Marcantel
Represented By: Trenton Christopher Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stanton
Represented By: Edward J. Laperouse, II
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Marcantel
Represented By: Trenton Christopher Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Kinchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Lato
Represented By: James Paul Nader
Represented By: Bayle Beermann
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Russell
Represented By: Charles R. Rumbley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawna Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Vado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Vado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bransett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curneshia Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Jermaine Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Burgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demerria Drake-Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kourtin Morrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Davidson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Scavo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?