Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC, et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, et al
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Old Republic Union Insurance, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, HUB International Limited and Robert Zetzmann
Counter Defendant: Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC and Hardy Rice Dryer LLC
Counter Claimant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Indian Harbor Insurance Company and Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00503
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The #7 Request for Oral Argument filed on October 8, 2021, by Plaintiffs Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC, and Hardy Rice Dryer, LLC, is DENIED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be set by separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 10/25/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Oral Argument. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be set by separate notice. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/22/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BKA)
October 21, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #7 MOTION for Oral Argument on #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Rew, Phillip)
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Rew, Phillip)
October 19, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition to #9 MOTION for Oral Argument on #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(1) and Rule 12(B)(6) and MOTION to Stay Arbitration Proceedings filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Rew, Phillip)
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Oral Argument on #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(1) and Rule 12(B)(6) and MOTION to Stay Arbitration Proceedings by Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC, Hardy Rice Dryer LLC. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(Reynaud, Claude)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(1) and Rule 12(B)(6) and MOTION to Stay Arbitration Proceedings filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Rew, Phillip)
October 12, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Oral Argument on #6 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Oral Argument on #6 MOTION to Remand by Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC, Hardy Rice Dryer LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Reynaud, Claude)
October 1, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
September 30, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC, Hardy Rice Dryer LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 proposed order)(Reynaud, Claude)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(1) and Rule 12(B)(6) and, MOTION to Stay Arbitration Proceedings by Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC, Hardy Rice Dryer LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 proposed order)(Reynaud, Claude)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Rew, Phillip). Modified on 9/22/2021 to edit event and text (LLH).
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 11/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 9/2/2021. (KAH)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC, Hardy Rice Dryer LLC by QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Steadfast Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Lexington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hoefer, Bruce)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District, Case Number 708983. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2336524), filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, HDI Global Specialty SE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 State Court Pleadings)(Hoefer, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC, et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Farmers Rice Milling Company, LLC
Represented By: Claude F. Reynaud, Jr.
Represented By: Candace B. Ford
Represented By: Carroll Devillier, Jr.
Represented By: Cullen J. Dupuy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Hardy Rice Dryer LLC
Represented By: Claude F. Reynaud, Jr.
Represented By: Candace B. Ford
Represented By: Carroll Devillier, Jr.
Represented By: Cullen J. Dupuy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Union Insurance
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUB International Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Zetzmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?