Young v. Payne et al
Plaintiff: Henry Young, III
Defendant: Benjamin Payne, Unknown Officer, City of Denham Springs, Louisiana and City of Denham Springs
Case Number: 3:2021cv00544
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/30/2021 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 12/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 10/21/2021. (KAH)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Henry Young, III. City of Denham Springs waiver sent on 10/19/2021, answer due 12/20/2021; Benjamin Payne waiver sent on 10/19/2021, answer due 12/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Long, Joseph)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Denham Springs, Benjamin Payne, Unknown Officer. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(EDC)
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2342656.), filed by Henry Young, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Summons, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Long, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Payne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Young, III
Represented By: Joseph Jerome Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Denham Springs, Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Denham Springs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?