Mason v. Ford Motor Co. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Mason
Defendant: REV Recreation Group Inc., Ford Motor Company, Dixie Motors, LLC and Dixie Motors, LLC doing business as Great American RV Superstores
Case Number: 3:2021cv00566
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2023 Filing 61 JURY VERDICT FORM. (SWE)
September 27, 2023 Filing 60 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick: Jury Trial completed on 9/27/2023. Parties present closing statements. Court instructs the jury. Jury returns verdict. Judgment will be signed accordingly. (Court Reporter S. Thompson.) (SWE)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: The Clerk of Court shall provide lunch for the jurors on Wednesday 9/27/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 9/27/2023. (JEG)
September 26, 2023 Filing 59 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick: Jury Trial held on 9/26/2023. Witnesses sworn and testified. Parties move for Rule 50 Judgment as a Matter of Law. Court grants as to Ford Motor Company and denies as to REV Recreation Group, Inc. and Dixie Motors, LLC. Stipulations read into record. Court recesses until 9/27/2023 at 8:45 a.m. (Court Reporter S. Thompson.) (SWE)
September 25, 2023 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick: Jury Trial held on 9/25/2023. Jury selected and sworn. Witnesses sworn and testified, exhibits filed. Court recesses until 9/26/2023 at 9:00 a.m. (Court Reporter S. Thompson.) Pursuant to Local Rules, offering parties shall retain custody of exhibits..(SWE)
September 24, 2023 Filing 56 Proposed Joint Jury Instructions by Lisa Mason. (Nordgren, Drew) Modified on 9/25/2023 to edit title of document. (JEG).
September 22, 2023 Filing 55 PRE-TRIAL MEMORANDUM by Dixie Motors, LLC, REV Recreation Group Inc.. (Moll, Corey)
September 19, 2023 Filing 54 PRE-TRIAL MEMORANDUM Regarding Comparative Fault by Lisa Mason. (Nordgren, Drew) Modified on 9/21/2023 to edit title of document. (JEG).
September 18, 2023 Filing 53 Proposed Joint Jury Instructions by Lisa Mason. (Nordgren, Drew) Modified on 9/20/2023 to edit title of document. (JEG).
September 18, 2023 Filing 52 Proposed Jury Verdict Form by Lisa Mason.. (Nordgren, Drew)
September 12, 2023 Filing 51 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick: Pretrial Conference held on 9/12/2023, #32 #47 Daubert MOTION in Limine to Exclude or, Alternatively, Limit the Testimony of Amir Kahn is DENIED. Pretrial order was discussed. The jury trial of this matter is set to begin on September 25, 2023, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3 and will last two to three days.Defense counsel shall upload exhibits to JERS by Monday, September 18, 2023, at 5:00 p.m. (SWE)
September 11, 2023 Filing 50 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #47 Daubert MOTION in Limine to Exclude or, Alternatively, Limit the Testimony of Amir Kahn filed by Lisa Mason. (Nordgren, Drew)
September 6, 2023 Filing 49 Proposed Findings of Fact by Ford Motor Company. (Maxwell, Robert)
September 5, 2023 Filing 48 Proposed Findings of Fact by Dixie Motors, LLC, REV Recreation Group Inc.. (Moll, Corey)
September 4, 2023 Filing 47 Daubert MOTION in Limine to Exclude or, Alternatively, Limit the Testimony of Amir Kahn by Dixie Motors, LLC, REV Recreation Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit "A" - Report of Amir Kahn)(Moll, Corey). Added MOTION in Limine on 9/6/2023 (JEG). Modified on 9/6/2023 to edit title of document. (JEG).
September 4, 2023 Filing 46 Proposed Findings of Fact by Lisa Mason. (Nordgren, Drew)
August 31, 2023 Filing 45 RULING denying #29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 8/31/2023. (SWE)
August 29, 2023 Filing 44 Proposed Pretrial Order by Lisa Mason (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Nordgren, Drew)
August 14, 2023 Filing 43 AFFIDAVIT of Settlement Efforts by Dixie Motors, LLC, REV Recreation Group Inc.. (Adams, Glenn)
July 24, 2023 Filing 42 Minute Entry/Video Settlement Conference Report for settlement conference held on 7/24/2023 before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes: After a period of negotiations, the parties were unable to resolve the claims in this case. All deadlines in the current Scheduling Order remain in effect, including the September 25, 2023 Jury Trial , unless otherwise ordered. (EWD) (Wilder-Doomes, Erin)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 VIDEO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 7/24/2023 at 01:30 PM in by video before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Participant Instructions)(BLR)
April 28, 2023 Filing 40 REPLY in Support of #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dixie Motors, LLC, REV Recreation Group Inc.. (Adams, Glenn)
April 18, 2023 Filing 39 Exhibit(s) to #36 Memorandum in Opposition to, by Lisa Mason. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sworn Affidavit of Plaintiff Lisa Mason, #2 Exhibit LM 1 - Text Communications Exchanged Between Lisa Mason and Dixie Motors, LLC)(Nordgren, Drew) Modified on 4/18/2023 to remove linkage to document 38. (JEG).
April 18, 2023 Filing 38 Notice of Deficiency with Administrative Procedure III(A)(1) as to #36 Memorandum in Opposition to,. Pursuant to Administrative Procedure III(A)(1), Each exhibit should be submitted individually in CM/ECF with an exhibit number and short description (e.g., Ex.1 Plaintiff Depo). REQUIRED CORRECTION: The filer is directed to refile the exhibits in the proper format using the event Exhibit located under Other Documents in the CM/ECF system and link the exhibits to the previously filed document. The main document for this event shall be an exhibit list of the exhibits being attached. Each exhibit MUST include a description (e.g., Ex.1 Plaintiff Depo). (LLH)
April 17, 2023 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #32 Daubert MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Amir Kahn filed by Lisa Mason. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P-1 Email Communication)(Nordgren, Drew)
April 17, 2023 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Lisa Mason. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Statement of Contested Facts, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Lisa Mason, #3 Exhibit Exhibit Attached to Affidavit of Lisa Mason)(Nordgren, Drew)
April 10, 2023 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Settlement Efforts by Lisa Mason. (Nordgren, Drew)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File opposition to #29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Opposition shall be filed no later than 4/17/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 3/30/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
March 30, 2023 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Delay for Summary Judgment Opposition by Lisa Mason (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Nordgren, Drew)
March 7, 2023 Filing 32 Daubert MOTION to Exclude the Testimony of Amir Kahn by Dixie Motors, LLC, REV Recreation Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memo In Support, #2 Exhibit A. Kahn Expert Report, #3 Exhibit Biazo Expert Report & CV, #4 Exhibit Biazo Supplemental Expert Reportq, #5 Exhibit Ford Motor Co's Expert Report)(Adams, Glenn) Modified on 3/8/2023 to edit title of document. (JEG).
March 7, 2023 Filing 31 Exhibit(s) to #29 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 30 Notice of Deficiency with Administrative Procedures III(A)(1),, by Dixie Motors, LLC, REV Recreation Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Deposition of Lisa Mason, #2 Exhibit B Deposition of Keith Mason, #3 Exhibit C Service Ticket 6-2021, #4 Exhibit D1 Affidavit of Don Bordelon, #5 Exhibit D2 Affidavit of Michael Mayeaux, #6 Exhibit E Email Mason to Fleetwood, #7 Exhibit F Plaintiff's Discovery responses, #8 Exhibit G Ford Motor Co.'s Expert Report, #9 Exhibit H Affidavit of Craig Biazo)(Adams, Glenn)
March 7, 2023 Filing 30 Notice of Deficiency with Administrative Procedure III(A)(1) as to #29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Pursuant to Administrative Procedure III(A)(1), Each exhibit should be submitted individually in CM/ECF with an exhibit number and short description (e.g., Ex.1 Plaintiff Depo). REQUIRED CORRECTION: The filer is directed to refile the exhibits in the proper format using the event Exhibit located under Other Documents in the CM/ECF system and link the exhibits to the previously filed document. The main document for this event shall be an exhibit list of the exhibits being attached. Each exhibit MUST include a description (e.g., Ex.1 Plaintiff Depo). (JEG)
March 6, 2023 Filing 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment by REV Recreation Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memo In Support, #2 Attachment Statement of Uncontested Facts, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D1, #7 Exhibit D2, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Adams, Glenn)
November 22, 2022 Filing 28 Expert Witness List by Ford Motor Company. (For your free look at document, enter your Individual PACER login and pw to confirm your right to view). (Maxwell, Robert) Modified on 11/23/2022 to edit title of document (JEG).
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Re-Urged Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadlines. Filing all discovery motions and completing all discovery except experts due by 10/30/2022. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 11/29/2022. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 12/12/2022. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 12/28/2022. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 1/9/2023. Discovery from Experts due by 2/14/2023. Motions shall be filed by 3/7/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/29/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2023 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 9/4/2023. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 8/14/2023. Proposed Findings of Fact due by 9/4/2023. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 9/18/2023. A 3-day Jury Trial set for 9/25/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 8/29/2022. (LLH) Modified on 8/29/2022 to edit text (LLH).
July 25, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #26 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadlines . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
July 22, 2022 Filing 26 Re-Urged Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadlines by Lisa Mason (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nordgren, Drew) Modified on 7/25/2022 to reflect title of document (JEG).
July 8, 2022 Filing 25 Notice to Counsel: In light of correspondence to the court from the parties, the Settlement Conference set for 7/11/2022 is CANCELED. The parties shall contact chambers when they wish to reschedule. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The #23 Unopposed Motion to Continue, filed by Plaintiff Lisa Mason, is DENIED. The proposed dispositive/Daubert motion deadline of March 7, 2023 does not comply with the district judge's scheduling requirements for a May 2, 2023 pretrial conference. The denial is without prejudice to reurging a motion that either: 1) does not seek to continue the current November 4, 2022 dispositive/Daubert motion deadline; or 2) seeks to continue the trial scheduled to being May 22, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 6/30/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
June 29, 2022 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadlines by Lisa Mason (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nordgren, Drew)
June 29, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #23 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Deadlines . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
May 17, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Wilder-Doomes is converting settlement conferences scheduled in July 2022 to VIDEO CONFERENCES in light of the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and the general orders of this Court. The settlement conference will be limited to two (2) hours and client(s)/client representative(s) are still required participants. All parties must have access to a microphone, camera and internet connection to participate in the conference, although a participant can log into the system from a smartphone after downloading the app. Participant instructions are attached. If you would prefer to have your settlement conference rescheduled for an in-person conference at a later date, please contact chambers at (225) 389-3584 as soon as possible. (BLR)
April 22, 2022 Filing 21 Exhibit(s) to #20 Crossclaim by REV Recreation Group Inc.. (Adams, Glenn)
April 22, 2022 Filing 20 CROSSCLAIM REV against Ford Motor Company, filed by REV Recreation Group Inc..(Adams, Glenn) Modified on 4/22/2022 (LLH).
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 7/11/2022 at 01:30 PM in chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/30/2021. (SWE)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. Amended Pleadings due by 4/29/2022. Discovery due by 6/30/2022. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 7/29/2022. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 8/12/2022. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 8/26/2022. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 9/9/2022. Discovery from Experts due by 10/14/2022. Proposed Findings of Facts due by 5/1/2023. Motions shall be filed by 11/4/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/18/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2023 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 5/1/2023. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 4/10/2023. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 5/15/2023. Jury Trial set for 5/22/2023 to 5/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/30/2021. (SWE)
December 27, 2021 Filing 17 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2022 is CANCELED pending review of the #16 Status Report filed. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 23, 2021 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT w/ Scheduling Order by Lisa Mason. (Nordgren, Drew)
December 3, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by REV Recreation Group Inc..(Adams, Glenn)
December 3, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Dixie Motors, LLC.(Adams, Glenn)
October 28, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by REV Recreation Group Inc..(Adams, Glenn)
October 25, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by REV Recreation Group Inc. (Adams, Glenn)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Ex Parte First Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings, filed by Defendant REV Recreation Group Inc, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(a). Responsive pleadings due 11/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/25/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
October 25, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by REV Recreation Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Adams, Glenn)
October 21, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America National Association for Ford Motor Company.. (Maxwell, Robert)
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company.(Maxwell, Robert)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/6/2022 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/13/2021. (BLR)
October 12, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by REV Recreation Group Inc.(LLH)
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 R. Doc. 5 no longer exists. Docketed in error. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) Modified to edit text on 10/13/2021 (BLR).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The #3 Motion for Leave of Court to File Amended Notice of Removal, filed by REV Recreation Group, Inc., is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is instructed to docket the [3-1] Amended Notice of Removal, which shall become REV Recreation Group Inc.'s operative Notice of Removal in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/12/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR) Modified to edit text on 10/13/2021 (BLR).
October 11, 2021 Filing 3 First MOTION to Amend Notice of Removal by REV Recreation Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Amended Notice of Removal, #2 Attachment Order)(Adams, Glenn)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE AND ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, on or before October 15, 2021, Defendant REV Recreation Group, Inc. shall file a motion for leave to file an amended Notice of Removal that is comprehensive (i.e., includes all of REV's numbered allegations, as revised, supplemented, and/or amended), which adequately alleges the citizenship of all parties to establish that the Court has diversity jurisdiction. The case will be allowed to proceed if jurisdiction is adequately established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/8/2021. (BLR)
October 5, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Plaintiffs, filed by REV Recreation Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Adams, Glenn) (Attachment 2 replaced on 10/6/2021 to flatten the image and modified to edit the text) (NLT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. Ford Motor Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Mason
Represented By: Drew Eastman Nordgren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REV Recreation Group Inc.
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Emily Stickney Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Robert William Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Motors, LLC doing business as Great American RV Superstores
Represented By: Glenn Brozman Adams
Represented By: Corey Daniel Moll
Represented By: Emily Stickney Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?