C. v. BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana
Plaintiff: Brett C.
Defendant: BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana
Not Classified By Court: Brian S. King and Larissa Lee
Case Number: 3:2021cv00589
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record. Attorney Michael C. Drew and Rachel Falgout Moody are enrolled as co-counsel for defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/9/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
December 6, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #23 MOTION to Enroll Michael C. Drew and Rachel F. Moody as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
December 2, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Enroll Michael C. Drew and Rachel F. Moody as Additional Attorney by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Sherburne, Richard)
December 1, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana.(Drew, Michael)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana answer due 12/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 11/1/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
October 29, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #2 Complaint, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
October 28, 2021 Filing 20 Consent MOTION to Extend Deadline for Filing Responsive Pleading to #2 Complaint, by BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Chapman, Jessica) Modified on 10/29/2021 to edit text (ELW)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Richard A. Sherburne, Jessica Wainwright Chapman,Douglas M. Chapoton for BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana replacing Timothy C. Houpt and Larissa Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/26/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
October 25, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #18 Joint MOTION to Substitute Richard A. Sherburne, Jessica W. Chapman, and Douglas M. Chapoton in place of Timothy C. Houpt and Larissa Lee as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT)
October 21, 2021 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Substitute Richard A. Sherburne, Jessica W. Chapman, and Douglas M. Chapoton in place of Timothy C. Houpt and Larissa Lee as Attorney by BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Sherburne, Richard)
October 15, 2021 Filing 17 Letter to Attorney Larissa Lee who is lead counsel for party BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT)
October 15, 2021 Filing 16 Letter to Attorney Brian S. King who is lead counsel for party Brett C.Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT)
October 15, 2021 Filing 15 Case transferred in from the Utah; Case Number 1:21-cv-00082. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 15, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Brian A. Jackson and Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Change Venue. This action shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana. Based upon that ruling, Defendant's previously filed #10 motion to transfer venue is MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 10/12/21. (dla) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2021.]
October 8, 2021 Filing 13 Stipulated MOTION to Change Venue to Transfer to the United States District Court Middle District of Louisiana filed by Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court Middle District of Louisiana) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett. Attorney Timothy C. Houpt added to party BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana(pty:dft)(Houpt, Timothy) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Richard Sherburne, Jr. re #10 MOTION to Change Venue filed by BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana. (Lee, Larissa) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Donna Southall re #10 MOTION to Change Venue filed by BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana. (Lee, Larissa) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana. Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Lee, Larissa) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2021.]
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File an Overlength Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 9/22/21. (dla) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2021.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 8 Ex Parte (Not Sealed) MOTION for Leave to File AN OVERLENTH MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE filed by Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File an Overlength Motion to Transfer Venue) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett.(Lee, Larissa) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2021.]
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint: the deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is either September 22, 2021, or 14 days after the court rules on any forthcoming Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 8/18/21. (dla) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2021.]
August 18, 2021 Filing 6 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Defendant BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint) Motions referred to Jared C. Bennett. Attorney Larissa Lee added to party BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana(pty:dft)(Lee, Larissa) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2021.]
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Brett C. as to BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana Waiver sent on 7/10/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2021.]
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 6/14/21. (dla) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2021.]
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr on 6/9/21. (dla) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4023563) filed by Brett C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (King, Brian) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2021.]
June 4, 2021 Filing 1 Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. Plaintiff Brett C. is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt) [Transferred from Utah on 10/15/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C. v. BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueCross BlueShield of Louisiana
Represented By: Richard Allen Sherburne, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas M. Chapoton
Represented By: Jessica Wainwright Chapman
Represented By: Michael C. Drew
Represented By: Rachel Falgout Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Brian S. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Larissa Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?