White v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Plaintiff: Sabrina White
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston and The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00634
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Iwana Rademaekers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 12/27/2021. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (Calhoun, Lindsay)
December 27, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Iwana Rademaekers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2378037) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Attachment)(Calhoun, Lindsay)
December 27, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Iwana Rademaekers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2378037). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sabrina White. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 11/5/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Pellegrin, David)
November 22, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sabrina White. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston waiver sent on 11/5/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Pellegrin, David)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 1/13/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 11/8/2021. (KAH)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (NLT)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2360159.), filed by Sabrina White. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Proposed Summons, #3 Affidavit Proposed Summons)(Pellegrin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina White
Represented By: David Craig Pellegrin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Represented By: Lindsay J. Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Represented By: Lindsay J. Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?