6600 Plaza Square, LLC et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London et al
Plaintiff: 6600 Plaza Square, LLC, 6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc. and 6600 Plaza
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, United Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Old Republic Union Insurance, Amrisc, LLC and Old Republic Union Insurance Company
Counter Claimant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: Leopoldo J. Yanez
Case Number: 3:2021cv00649
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 20 REPLY in Support of #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Rew, Phillip)
January 6, 2022 Filing 19 Notice to Counsel: The Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2022 is CANCELED pending resolution of the #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. No Status Report is due at this time. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by 6600 Plaza, 6600 Plaza Square, LLC. Signed by Judge John W. deGravelles on 1/4/2022. (SWE)
January 3, 2022 Filing 17 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;, #3 Attachment)(Follette, Patrick)
December 23, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Follette, Patrick) (Main Document 16 and Attachment 1 replaced on 1/5/2022 in accordance with RD 18) (SWE).
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting for good cause shown #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Plead, filed by Defendant AmRisc, LLC. AmRisc's responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint due no later than ten days from this Court's entry of a ruling on the #5 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/22/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
December 22, 2021 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Amrisc, LLC. (Yanez, Leopoldo)
December 22, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Defendants' Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs 6600 Plaza Square, LLC and 6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc. for good cause shown. Plaintiffs' responsive pleadings to Defendants' Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment due no later than ten days from this Court's entry of a ruling on #5 Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/17/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead, filed by Defendant AmRisc, LLC. Responsive pleadings for AmRisc, LLC due 12/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/16/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EWD)
December 15, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of No Opposition to #7 for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company re 10 Order. (Rew, Phillip) Modified on 12/15/2021 to edit text. (EDC).
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE AND ORDER: Plaintiffs 6600 Plaza Square LLC and 6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc., filed a #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Defendants' Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment, which seeks an extension of time to respond to Defendants' #2 Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment while Plaintiffs' #5 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings is decided. The supporting memorandum states that Defendants' position on the Motion was sought, but not obtained. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that, by no later than Thursday, December 16, 2021, Defendants shall file a notice with the Court, indicating whether any of them intends to oppose the #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Defendants' Counterclaim for Declaratory Judgment. In the event any defendant intends to oppose the Motion, its opposition memorandum will be due within normal briefing delays under Local Civil Rule 7(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/14/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.)(BLR)
December 14, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amrisc, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Truist Insurance Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Truist Bank, Other Affiliate Truist Financial Corporation for Amrisc, LLC.. (Yanez, Leopoldo)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Amrisc, LLC. (Yanez, Leopoldo)
December 8, 2021 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS TO DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIM FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
December 7, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings to Defendant's Counterclaim by 6600 Plaza, 6600 Plaza Square, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Follette, Patrick) Modified on 12/8/2021 to edit text (LLH).
December 3, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Briefing Schedule on #5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration : Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 21 days from the filing of the motion and shall not exceed 25 pages excluding attachments. The mover may file a reply brief within 14 days of the filing of the opposition and shall be limited to a total of 10 pages. No motion for leave will be required. Sur-Reply briefs will be permitted only with leave of Court for extraordinary reasons supported by sufficient facts. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KDC)
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1-Case law)(Rew, Phillip). Added MOTION to Stay on 12/3/2021 (EDC).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/20/2022 at 03:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/15/2021. (BLR)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Leopoldo Yanez who is lead counsel for party Amrisc, LLC. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (NLT)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against 6600 Plaza Square, LLC, 6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc. by Steadfast Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance, United Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Safety Specialty Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Arbitration Clause, #2 Exhibit 2 - Policy)(Hoefer, Bruce)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District, Case Number 712775. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2362189), filed by HDI Global Specialty SE, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Arbitration Clause, #3 Exhibit C - Policy, #4 Exhibit D - Consents, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hoefer, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 6600 Plaza Square, LLC et al v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 6600 Plaza Square, LLC
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: Matthew Arthur Sherman
Represented By: Patrick Roger Follette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 6600 Plaza, a Condominium Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 6600 Plaza
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: Matthew Arthur Sherman
Represented By: Patrick Roger Follette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDI Global Specialty SE
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Union Insurance
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amrisc, LLC
Represented By: Nancy Scott Degan
Represented By: Leopoldo Joaquin Yanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Union Insurance Company
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.
Represented By: D. Russell Holwadel
Represented By: Heather England Reznik, Femal
Represented By: Kyle Matthew Truxillo
Represented By: Phillip J. Rew
Represented By: Richard R. Stedman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Leopoldo J. Yanez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?