Labat v. Shell Pipeline Company, LP
Plaintiff: Richard Labat
Defendant: Shell Pipeline Company, LP
Case Number: 3:2021cv00690
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 2/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/27/2021. (BLR)
December 6, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Petition for Damages by Shell Pipeline Company, LP.(McGoey, Thomas) Modified on 12/7/2021 to edit the text (SWE).
November 29, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Removal to Adverse Parties by Shell Pipeline Company, LP re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McGoey, Thomas)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet and Attachment by Shell Pipeline Company, LP re #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachment A)(McGoey, Thomas)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2368865), filed by Shell Pipeline Company, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(McGoey, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Labat v. Shell Pipeline Company, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Labat
Represented By: Douglas R. Kraus
Represented By: Chelsea Brener Cusimano
Represented By: Susannah Cooley McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Pipeline Company, LP
Represented By: Thomas J. McGoey, II
Represented By: Courtney Harper Turkington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?