Gulotta v. Sukhwant et al
Plaintiff: Rennan Gulotta
Defendant: Singh Sukhwant, AS Express Corp and Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00732
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Singh Sukhwant.(Macdonald, Ian)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. The scheduling conference set for 3/10/2022 is CANCELLED. Amended Pleadings due by 7/13/2022. F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 3/15/2022. Discovery due by 12/12/2022. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 10/17/2022. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 11/15/2022. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 11/15/2022. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 12/16/2022. Discovery from Experts due by 2/14/2023. Dispositive and Daubert Motions shall be filed by 3/17/2023. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/5/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2023 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 9/11/2023. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 8/21/2023. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 9/11/2023. Five day Jury Trial set for 10/2/2023 - 10/6/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/7/2022. (EDC)
February 28, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rennan Gulotta. Singh Sukhwant served on 2/24/2022, answer due 3/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Caballero, Ricardo)
February 24, 2022 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT by Rennan Gulotta. (Caballero, Ricardo)
February 18, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by AS Express Corp, Progressive Casualty Insurance Company.(Macdonald, Ian)
February 17, 2022 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Singh Sukhwant. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
February 17, 2022 Filing 11 Request for Summons by Rennan Gulotta (Caballero, Ricardo) Modified on 2/17/2022 to edit text.(EDC).
February 10, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rennan Gulotta. Progressive Casualty Insurance Company served on 2/10/2022, answer due 3/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Caballero, Ricardo)
February 8, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rennan Gulotta. AS Express Corp served on 2/4/2022, answer due 2/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Caballero, Ricardo)
January 3, 2022 Filing 8 Civil Cover Page by Rennan Gulotta re #1 Complaint (Caballero, Ricardo)
January 3, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 3/10/2022 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 2/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/3/2022.(SGO)
December 31, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Summons by Rennan Gulotta (Caballero, Ricardo) Modified on 1/3/2022 to edit the text (NLT).
December 31, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Summons by Rennan Gulotta (Caballero, Ricardo) Modified on 1/3/2022 to edit the text (NLT).
December 31, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Summons by Rennan Gulotta (Caballero, Ricardo) Modified on 1/3/2022 to edit the text (NLT).
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 There is no document #2. Entered in error by Case Administrator (LLH).
December 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2377974.), filed by Rennan Gulotta.(Caballero, Ricardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulotta v. Sukhwant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rennan Gulotta
Represented By: Ricardo A. Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singh Sukhwant
Represented By: Ian A. Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AS Express Corp
Represented By: Ian A. Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Ian A. Macdonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?