Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Pamela Johnson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2022cv00180
Filed: March 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: John W deGravelles
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2022 Filing 12 CONSENT to Proceed before US Magistrate by Commissioner of Social Security. (Green, Katherine)
August 1, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT OF ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certification Page, #2 Attachment Court Transcript Index, #3 Attachment Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, #4 Attachment Payment Documents and Decisions, #5 Attachment Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, #6 Attachment Non Disability Related Development, #7 Attachment Disability Related Development, #8 Attachment Medical Records 1, #9 Attachment Medical Records 2, #10 Attachment Medical Records 3)(Green, Katherine)
July 19, 2022 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Parties by Pamela Johnson (Misko, Benjamin)
June 14, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Johnson. Commissioner of Social Security served on 6/13/2022, answer due 8/12/2022. (Wicklund, Edward)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: This action for judicial review of the administrative decision shall proceed in accordance with the schedule stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/29/2022. (KAH)
March 23, 2022 Filing 7 There is no document #7. Entered in error by Case Administrator (LLH).
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Edward A. Wicklund to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/23/2022. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
March 23, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, US Atty General and US Attorney's Office (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file said complaint without prepayment of costs or security thereof and the Clerk is directed to issue process to the defendant(s). The plaintiff(s) is responsible for service of summons and complaint on the defendant(s). Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/22/2022. (ELW)
March 16, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Edward A. Wicklund to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2406533) by Pamela Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Vice Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Misko, Benjamin)
March 16, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pamela Johnson. (Misko, Benjamin)
March 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Pamela Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Misko, Benjamin)
March 16, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis , #3 MOTION for Edward A. Wicklund to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2406533). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin M. Misko
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Katherine Krupa Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?