Blank et al v. United Property & Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Blank and Ursula Blank
Defendant: United Property and Casualty Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00289
Filed: May 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2022 Filing 8 Letter to Attorney Sheila Tolar regarding Clint Brasher, Joe Muckleroy and Nishi Kothari who are Co-Counsel for party Jeffrey and Ursula Blank. Attorneys are not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC)
May 5, 2022 Filing 7 Case transferred in from the Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00911. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
May 5, 2022 Case assigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick and Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #5 Motion to Transfer Case is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer immediately and without delay the above captioned case to United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 5/4/2022.(cwa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/5/2022.]
May 3, 2022 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Transfer Case to Louisiana Middle District by United Property and Casualty Insurance Co., Ursula Blank, Jeffrey Blank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Bette R. Matheny added to party United Property and Casualty Insurance Co.(pty:dft).(Matheny, Bette) Modified text/filers on 5/3/2022 (cwa). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/5/2022.]
April 8, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United Property & Casualty Company. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/5/2022.]
April 8, 2022 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/5/2022.]
April 6, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/5/2022.]
April 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against United Property & Casualty Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9305436) filed by Jeffrey Blank, Ursula Blank. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Shelia Renee Tolar added to party Jeffrey Blank(pty:pla), Attorney Shelia Renee Tolar added to party Ursula Blank(pty:pla).(Tolar, Shelia) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/8/2022) (jeg). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 5/5/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blank et al v. United Property & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Blank
Represented By: Shelia Renee Tolar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Blank
Represented By: Shelia Renee Tolar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Property and Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Nicholas Paul Arnold
Represented By: Bette R. Matheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?