Smith v. L'Auberge Casino & Hotel Baton Rouge et al
Plaintiff: Vickie R Smith
Defendant: Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc., Penn National Gaming, Inc, Gaming and Leisure Properties, Inc. and LAuberge Casino & Hotel Baton Rouge
Not Classified By Court: Kimberly J. Fultz
Case Number: 3:2022cv00825
Filed: October 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Filing 15 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon The Neuromedical Center on 11/10/2022 by Personal (Pryor, Matthew) Modified on 11/22/2022 to reflect name of person served (JEG).
November 22, 2022 Filing 14 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Pinnacle Home Health on 11/10/2022 by Personal (Pryor, Matthew) Modified on 11/22/2022 to reflect name of person served (JEG).
November 22, 2022 Filing 13 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Dr. John Whatley on 11/10/2022 by Personal (Pryor, Matthew) Modified on 11/22/2022 to reflect name of person served (JEG).
November 22, 2022 Filing 12 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Baton Rouge Orthopedic Clinic, PT on 11/10/2022 by Personal (Pryor, Matthew) Modified on 11/22/2022 to reflect name of person served (JEG).
November 22, 2022 Filing 11 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Our Lady of the Lake Hospital on 11/9/2022 by Personal (Pryor, Matthew) Modified on 11/22/2022 to reflect name of person served (JEG).
November 22, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) executed upon Dr. Mary Dickerson on 11/9/2022 by Personal (Pryor, Matthew) Modified on 11/22/2022 to reflect name of person served (JEG).
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2023 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 1/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/3/2022. (BLR)
November 2, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL, filed by Gaming and Leisure Properties, Inc., Penn National Gaming, Inc, Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. (LLH)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The #6 Motion for Leave to File Amended and Comprehensive Notice of Removal, filed by Defendants Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc., Penn Entertainment, Inc. f/k/a Penn National Gaming, Inc. and Gaming and Leisure Properties, Inc., is GRANTED. The Motion for Leave was filed to comply with the Courts #5 Notice and Order to correct citizenship allegations as to certain parties in the original #1 Notice of Removal. The Clerk of Court is instructed to docket the [6-1] Amended Comprehensive Notice of Removal, which will become the operative notice of removal in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/2/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 1, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended and Comprehensive Notice of Removal by Gaming and Leisure Properties, Inc., LAuberge Casino & Hotel Baton Rouge, Penn National Gaming, Inc, Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Pleading, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Pryor, Matthew)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 11/4/2022 the removing defendants shall file a Motion for Leave to File amended notice of removal providing the citizenship of Plaintiff Vickie R. Smith and Defendant Penn National Gaming, Inc., by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/28/2022. (JEG)
October 25, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by Gaming and Leisure Properties, Inc., LAuberge Casino & Hotel Baton Rouge, Penn National Gaming, Inc, Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc. (Pryor, Matthew)
October 25, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #1 Notice of Removal. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. . (JEG) Modified on 10/25/2022 to edit text (JEG).
October 25, 2022 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Kimberly J. Fultz who is lead counsel for party Vckie R. Smith. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (JEG)
October 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number C-722611 Sec 24. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2494753), filed by Gaming and Leisure Properties, Inc., Penn National Gaming, Inc, Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Discovery Directed to Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B Plaintiffs responses to discovery, #4 Attachment State Court Pleading Petition, #5 Attachment State Court Pleading Discovery with Petition, #6 Attachment State Court Pleading Request for POD with Pe, #7 Attachment State Court Pleading Citation, #8 Attachment State Court Pleading Return of Service, #9 Attachment State Court Pleading Return of Service, #10 Attachment State Court Pleading Cover Letter, #11 Attachment State Court Pleading Answer, #12 Attachment State Court Pleading Request for Noticee)(Pryor, Matthew) Modified on 10/25/2022 to edit State Court Information (JEG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. L'Auberge Casino & Hotel Baton Rouge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie R Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn National Gaming, Inc
Represented By: Matthew W. Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaming and Leisure Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAuberge Casino & Hotel Baton Rouge
Represented By: Matthew W. Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kimberly J. Fultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?