Earl v. Ace American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Rodney Earl
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company, Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. and Robert Leach
Case Number: 3:2022cv00881
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The #10 Motion to Substitute Pleadings filed by Defendants is GRANTED. Because Defendants' pleadings did not comply with this Court's Local Rules, the Clerk's Office will make the following substitutions: R. Doc. 10-1 substituted for R. Doc. 1; R. Doc. 10-2 substituted for R. Doc. 4; and R. Doc. 10-3 substituted for R. Doc. 5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 11/21/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The #9 Motion to Strike filed by Defendants is GRANTED. The Clerk's Office is instructed to strike R. Doc. 7 from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 11/21/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
November 18, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal; Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE American Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. , #9 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 7 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal; Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE American Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, In. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
November 18, 2022 *** Add Interested Person by Ace American Insurance Company, Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., Robert Leach identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Gordon McKernan Injury Attorneys, Affiliate/Interested Person Rodney Earl, Affiliate/Interested Person Robert Leach, Affiliate/Interested Person Michael Joseph Montalbano, III, Affiliate/Interested Person Kent M. Adams, Affiliate/Interested Person Donald G. Cassels, III, Affiliate/Interested Person Clean Harbors, Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person Ace American Insurance Company, Affiliate/Interested Person Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. for Ace American Insurance Company, Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., Robert Leach. (Cassels, Donald)
November 17, 2022 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal; Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE American Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Reformatted Notice of Removal), #2 Exhibit B (Reformatted Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE American Insurance Company), #3 Exhibit C (Reformatted Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.), #4 Attachment Proposed Order)(Cassels, Donald)
November 17, 2022 Filing 9 Ex Parte MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 7 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal; Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE American Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Cassels, Donald)
November 17, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #6 Certificate of Interested Persons. Failure to add interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (EDC)
November 17, 2022 MOTION(S) REFERRED: 7 Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal; Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE American Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
November 16, 2022 Filing 7 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal; Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE American Insurance Company; Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. by All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Reformatted Notice of Removal), # 2 Exhibit B (Reformatted Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE American Insurance Company), # 3 Exhibit C (Reformatted Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.), # 4 Attachment Proposed Order)(Cassels, Donald) Modified on 11/21/2022 vto remove document as per Order # 11(LLH).
November 15, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Ace American Insurance Company, Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., Robert Leach (Cassels, Donald) (Main Document 6 replaced on 11/17/2022) (EDC). Modified on 11/17/2022 to flatten document. (EDC).
November 15, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Clean Harbors, Inc. for Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.. (Cassels, Donald) Modified on 11/21/2022 to replace document per Order # 12 (LLH).
November 15, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ace American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc. for Ace American Insurance Company. (Cassels, Donald) Modified on 11/21/2022 to replace document per Order # 12 (LLH).
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2023 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 2/9/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 11/14/2022. (KAH)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #1 Notice of Removal. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (EDC)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Louisiana 19 Judicial District Court, Case Number 722497. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2503274), filed by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., Ace American Insurance Company, Robert Leach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response Defendants' Request for Admission, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Cassels, Donald) Modified on 11/21/2022 to replace document per Order # 12 (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Earl v. Ace American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Earl
Represented By: Michael J. Montalbano, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Donald Goodwin Cassels, III
Represented By: Kent M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Goodwin Cassels, III
Represented By: Kent M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Leach
Represented By: Donald Goodwin Cassels, III
Represented By: Kent M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?