Wallace v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Stephanie Wallace
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00953
Filed: December 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Brian A Jackson
2 Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 4/20/2023 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 4/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 2/1/2023. (KAH)
December 6, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Allstate Indemnity Company. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
December 6, 2022 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick. Judge Brian A. Jackson no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (EDC)
December 5, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Stephanie Wallace identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Allstate Indemnity Company, Affiliate/Interested Person McClenny Moseley & Associates, PLLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Stephanie Wallace for Stephanie Wallace. (Reynaud, Claude)
December 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2511328.), filed by Stephanie Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons)(Reynaud, Claude)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Wallace
Represented By: Claude F. Reynaud, III
Represented By: R. William Huye, III
Represented By: Cameron Sean Snowden
Represented By: Grant P. Gardiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?