Williams v. L'Oreal USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Katherine Williams
Defendant: L'Oreal USA, Inc., L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., Dabur USA, Ltd, Dabur International, Ltd., Godrej Son Holdings, Inc., Namaste Laboratories, LLC, Soft Sheen-Carson, LLC, Soft Sheen-Carson, Inc., Dabur USA, Inc. and Strength of Nature Global, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00150
Filed: February 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Filing 15 Return on Electronic Transfer from Northern District of Illinois. (LLH)
March 14, 2023 Filing 14 Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Northern District of Illinois. (JEG)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (JEG)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(JEG)
March 13, 2023 Filing 11 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Minute Order NEF) (LLH)
March 9, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Substitute Complaint and summons . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
March 8, 2023 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Substitute #1 Complaint and summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Complaint, #2 Proposed Pleading; Summons, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Beh, Thomas) Modified on 3/9/2023 to edit title of document (JEG).
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff's #5 Motion to Substitute is GRANTED, and the Clerk of Court will substitute the corrected Complaint (R. Doc. 5-2) and its attachments (R. Docs. 5-3 to 5-11) in place of the original Complaint (R. Doc. 1) and its attachments (R. Docs. 1-1 to 1-9). Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 3/7/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
March 3, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #6 Certificate of Interested Persons. Failure to add interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (JEG)
March 3, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #5 MOTION to Substitute Complaint, summons and civil cover sheet . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
March 2, 2023 Filing 7 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible case. Letter designated attachments sent via NEF. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (JEG)
March 2, 2023 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Katherine Williams (Beh, Thomas)
March 2, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to Substitute Pleadings re #1 Complaint by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Complaint, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Summons, #5 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Summons, #6 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Summons, #7 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Summons, #8 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Summons, #9 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Summons, #10 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Summons, #11 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Revised Summons)(Beh, Thomas) Modified on 3/3/2023 to edit title of document and to add linkage to document 1 (JEG).
March 1, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Dabur International, Ltd., Godrej Son Holdings, Inc., L'Oreal USA Products, Inc., L'Oreal USA, Inc., Soft Sheen Carson (W. I.), Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (JEG) (Main Document 4 replaced on 3/1/2023 to remove extra page) (JEG).
March 1, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Strength of Nature, LLC and Dabur USA, LTD. The named person/entity is not reflected on the docket sheet as a party in the case. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (JEG)
March 1, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #1 Complaint. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (JEG)
February 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2548363.), filed by Katherine Williams. (Attachments: #1 Attachment civil cover sheet, #2 Attachment Summons (Beh, Thomas) (Attachments 1-9 replaced on 3/1/2023 to flatten documents.) (JEG). ( #3 Attachment Summons, #4 Attachment Summons, #5 Attachment Summons, #6 Attachment Summons, #7 Attachment Summons, #8 Attachment Summons, #9 Attachment Summons). Modified on 3/7/2023 to replace documents as per Order #9 (LLH). Modified on 3/7/2023 to replace complaint (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. L'Oreal USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Williams
Represented By: Thomas Matthew Beh
Represented By: Stephen B. Murray
Represented By: Stephen B. Murray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dabur USA, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dabur International, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godrej Son Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Namaste Laboratories, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soft Sheen-Carson, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soft Sheen-Carson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dabur USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strength of Nature Global, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?