Bradley et al v. Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, et al
Plaintiff: Timothy J Bradley and Alana Bradley
Defendant: HMO Louisiana, Inc, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana and Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association
Case Number: 3:2023cv00310
Filed: April 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
2 Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Oppose Plaintiffs Motion to Remand. The deadline to oppose Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (R. Doc. #8 ) is extended to 6/26/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/9/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
June 8, 2023 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by HMO Louisiana, Inc, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order re Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Oppose Plaintiffs" Motion to Remand)(Blunt, Shelton)
May 23, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 7/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Counsel for Plaintiff(s) shall initiate the call to all parties then contact the Court at (225) 389-3602. Status Report due by 7/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/19/2023. (SGO)
May 22, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Affidavit of Timothy Bradley)(Robertson, Robert)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendant HMO Louisiana, Inc and Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana are granted an extension of time until 5/18/2023 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/2/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
May 1, 2023 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by HMO Louisiana, Inc, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order re Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings)(Blunt, Shelton) Modified on 5/2/2023 to edit the text (NLT).
May 1, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, R. Doc 1-1 Plaintiff's Petition for Breach of Contract, Damages, Monies Due and Penalties. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal. The Clerk's Office shall substitute R. Doc. 3-2 in place of R. Doc. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/26/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
April 24, 2023 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons by HMO Louisiana, Inc, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana identifying Affiliate/Interested Person HMO Louisiana, Inc. for HMO Louisiana, Inc, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana.. (Blunt, Shelton)
April 24, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 MOTION to Substitute Corrected Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
April 24, 2023 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr.. Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT)
April 21, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Substitute Corrected Notice of Removal by HMO Louisiana, Inc, Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Corrected Notice of Removal)(Blunt, Shelton)
April 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #1 Notice of Removal. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (EDC)
April 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court, Case Number 729576. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2572239), filed by Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana, HMO Louisiana, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted State Court Record, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Ginger Bradley with attachments, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Blunt, Shelton) Modified on 4/27/2023 to replace document as per Order #5 (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradley et al v. Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy J Bradley
Represented By: Emile Joseph, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Anthony Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana Bradley
Represented By: Emile Joseph, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Anthony Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMO Louisiana, Inc
Represented By: Shelton Dennis Blunt
Represented By: Douglas M. Chapoton
Represented By: Erica Schirling Aguillard
Represented By: Karleen Joseph Green
Represented By: Monica M Vela-Vick
Represented By: Richard Allen Sherburne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company d/b/a Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana
Represented By: Shelton Dennis Blunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Louisiana
Represented By: Richard Allen Sherburne, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas M. Chapoton
Represented By: Erica Schirling Aguillard
Represented By: Karleen Joseph Green
Represented By: Monica M Vela-Vick
Represented By: Shelton Dennis Blunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?