In The Matter of American Commercial Barge Line LLC and ACBL Transportation Services LLC, as Owners Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Safety Goal, its Engines, Tackle, Gear, Appurtenances, etc. In Rem
In Re: American Commercial Barge Line LLC and ACBL Transportation Services, LLC
Claimant: George Bates, Marquette Transportation Company, LLC and Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00364
Filed: May 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2023 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons by Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC, Marquette Transportation Company, LLC identifying Affiliate/Interested Person George Bates, Affiliate/Interested Person ACBL Transportation Services LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person American Commercial Barge Line LLC for Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC, Marquette Transportation Company, LLC. (McLeod, Evans)
July 7, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, for Exoneration From or Limitation of Liability and Claim by Marquette by Marquette Transportation Company, LLC, Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC.(McLeod, Evans)
July 5, 2023 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Persons by George Bates identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Marquette Transportation Company, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person ACBL Transportation Services LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person American Commercial Barge Line LLC for George Bates. (Shelton, Trenton) Modified on 7/6/2023 to reflect correct designation of affiliate/interested persons. (JEG).
July 5, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #11 Claim/Answer. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (JEG)
June 30, 2023 Filing 11 Answer and Affirmative Defenses and CLaims by George Bates. (Shelton, Trenton) Modified on 7/5/2023 to edit title of document. (JEG).
May 31, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE to Claimants of Complaint for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability. (JEG)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Order Approving Complainant's Security, Declaration of Value, Ad Interim Stipulation, Directing Issuance of Notice to Claimants and Restraining Prosecution of Claims. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/30/2023. (JEG)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Deposit Funds into Registry of the Court in Lieu of Cost Bond. The Clerk of Court shall accept and deposit into the Registry of the Court the amount of $250.00 on behalf of American Commercial Barge Line LLC and ACBL Transportation Services LLC in lieu of filing a cost bond. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/30/2023. (JEG)
May 31, 2023 Notice of Payment of $250.00 Bond Into Registry of Court in Lieu of Cost Bond by ACBL Transportation Services, LLC, American Commercial Barge Line LLC. Filing fee $ 250, receipt number ALAMDC-2588591. Into Registry of Court in Lieu of Cost Bond (Rice, Kathleen)
May 16, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #6 Certificate of Interested Persons. Failure to add interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (JEG)
May 16, 2023 *** Add Interested Person by ACBL Transportation Services, LLC, American Commercial Barge Line LLC identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Marquette Transportation Co. Gulf -Inland, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Marquette Transportation Company, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Roland Christensen, Affiliate/Interested Person Patrick McShane, Affiliate/Interested Person Danica Denny, Affiliate/Interested Person Kathleen Rice, Affiliate/Interested Person Phoebe Frilot, Affiliate/Interested Person Blake Donewar, Affiliate/Interested Person Daniel Schwank, Affiliate/Interested Person Klotz, Affiliate/Interested Person Denman Mims, Affiliate/Interested Person George Bates, Affiliate/Interested Person A. M. Tony Clayton, Affiliate/Interested Person Evans McLeod for ACBL Transportation Services, LLC, American Commercial Barge Line LLC. (Rice, Kathleen) Modified on 5/16/2023 to edit text (LLH).
May 15, 2023 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by ACBL Transportation Services, LLC, American Commercial Barge Line LLC identifying Corporate Parent ACBL Transportation Services, LLC, Corporate Parent American Commercial Barge Line LLC for ACBL Transportation Services, LLC, American Commercial Barge Line LLC. (Rice, Kathleen)
May 15, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #1 Complaint. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (JEG)
May 12, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACBL Transportation Services, LLC, American Commercial Barge Line LLC identifying Corporate Parent Commercial Barge Line Holdings LLC for ACBL Transportation Services, LLC, American Commercial Barge Line LLC.. (Rice, Kathleen)
May 12, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Deposit Funds into Registry of the Court in Lieu of Cost Bond by ACBL Transportation Services, LLC, American Commercial Barge Line LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Rice, Kathleen)
May 12, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Order Approving Complainant's Security, Declaration of Value, Ad Interim Stipulation, Directing Issuance of Notice to Claimants and Restraining Prosecution of Claims by all Plaintiffs by ACBL Transportation Services, LLC, American Commercial Barge Line LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Notice, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Ad Interim Stipulation)(Rice, Kathleen)
May 12, 2023 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT for Exoneration From or Limitation of LIability against American Commercial Barge Line LLC, ACBL Transportation Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2580994.), filed by American Commercial Barge Line LLC, ACBL Transportation Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Declaration of Value)(Rice, Kathleen) Modified on 5/15/2023 to edit title of document. (JEG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In The Matter of American Commercial Barge Line LLC and ACBL Transportation Services LLC, as Owners Pro Hac Vice of the M/V Safety Goal, its Engines, Tackle, Gear, Appurtenances, etc. In Rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: American Commercial Barge Line LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Pontier Rice
Represented By: Phoebe Hathorn
Represented By: Denman Thomas Mims
Represented By: Daniel Ernst Schwank
Represented By: Gillis W.P. Klotz
Represented By: Patrick J. McShane
Represented By: Blake Donewar
Represented By: Danica C. Denny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: ACBL Transportation Services, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Pontier Rice
Represented By: Gillis W.P. Klotz
Represented By: Phoebe Hathorn
Represented By: Patrick J. McShane
Represented By: Blake Donewar
Represented By: Danica C. Denny
Represented By: Daniel Ernst Schwank
Represented By: Denman Thomas Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: George Bates
Represented By: Richard J Ward, III
Represented By: Michael Charles Hendry
Represented By: Randall Gay, Jr
Represented By: Trenton Anderson Shelton
Represented By: Brilliant Pierre Clayton
Represented By: Michael Paul Fruge'
Represented By: Tony Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marquette Transportation Company, LLC
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Represented By: Magdalini Galitou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Marquette Transportation Company Gulf-Inland, LLC
Represented By: Evans Martin McLeod
Represented By: Magdalini Galitou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?