Dietrich v. State of Louisiana
Plaintiff: Brian Dietrich
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2023cv00503
Filed: June 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account filed by Brian Dietrich. Plaintiff shall pay the full filing fee of $402.00 to the Clerk of this Court on or before 08/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 08/09/2023. (NLT)
June 29, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account. This motion is now pending before the USMJ., ***Set CASE REFERRED Flag (PPS) (NLT)
June 28, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Statement of Account by Brian Dietrich (NLT)
June 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State of Louisiana, filed by Brian Dietrich.(NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dietrich v. State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Dietrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?