Voice of the Experienced et al v. LeBlanc et al
Plaintiff: Voice of the Experienced, Myron Smith, Damaris Jackson, Nate Walker and Darrius Williams
Defendant: James LeBlanc, Timothy Hooper, Misty Stagg, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections and Prison Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv01304
Filed: September 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Filing 14 Notice to Counsel: In light of the Court's Order (R. Doc. 13), the Scheduling Conference is reset for 1/18/2024 at 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. A Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings pursuant to local rule 7(a). Defendants' responsive pleadings due 12/7/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/6/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 6, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 Defendants' Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BLR)
November 3, 2023 Filing 12 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint, by Timothy Hooper, James LeBlanc, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Prison Enterprises, Inc., Misty Stagg (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Blanchfield, Andrew)
October 30, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Damaris Jackson, Myron Smith, Voice of the Experienced, Nate Walker, Darrius Williams. All Defendants. (Bosalavage, Samantha)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 11/30/2023 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 11/16/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/27/2023. (BLR)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Oren Nissim Nimni to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 9/20/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
September 20, 2023 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to James LeBlanc, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Prison Enterprises, Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JEG)
September 19, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Submitted as to James LeBlanc, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Prison Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Updated Summons James LeBlanc, #2 Attachment Updated Summons Prison Enterprises, Inc.)(Bosalavage, Samantha) (Main Document and Attachments 1 - 2 replaced on 9/20/2023 to flatten documents.) (JEG).
September 19, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for James M. LeBlanc. The named person/entity is not reflected on the docket sheet as a party in the case. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (JEG)
September 19, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Timothy Hooper, Misty Stagg. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JEG)
September 19, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Louisiana Department of Corrections & Public Safety and Prison Enterprises. The named persons/entities are not reflected on the docket sheet as a party in the case. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (JEG)
September 19, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Oren Nimni to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2637747). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
September 16, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Damaris Jackson, Myron Smith, Voice of the Experienced, Nate Walker, Darrius Williams identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Nate Walker, Affiliate/Interested Person James LeBlanc, Affiliate/Interested Person Timothy Hooper, Affiliate/Interested Person Voice of the Experienced, Affiliate/Interested Person Rights Behind Bars, Affiliate/Interested Person Damaris Jackson, Affiliate/Interested Person Misty Stagg, Affiliate/Interested Person Prison Enterprises, Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person Darrius Williams, Affiliate/Interested Person Promise of Justice Initiative, Affiliate/Interested Person Myron Smith, Affiliate/Interested Person Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections for Damaris Jackson, Darrius Williams, Myron Smith, Nate Walker, Voice of the Experienced. (Wright, Lydia)
September 16, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Oren Nimni to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2637747) by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Nimni Decl., #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Wright, Lydia)
September 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Hooper, James LeBlanc, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Prison Enterprises, Inc., Misty Stagg ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2637744.), filed by Damaris Jackson, Myron Smith, Voice of the Experienced, Nate Walker, Darrius Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - LeBlanc, #3 Summons - Hooper, #4 Summons - Stagg, #5 Summons - DOC, #6 Summons - Prison Enterprises)(Wright, Lydia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voice of the Experienced et al v. LeBlanc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Voice of the Experienced
Represented By: Samantha Nicole Bosalavage
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: Kenyatta Barthelemy
Represented By: Claude-Michael Comeau
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myron Smith
Represented By: Kenyatta Barthelemy
Represented By: Claude-Michael Comeau
Represented By: Samantha Nicole Bosalavage
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damaris Jackson
Represented By: Claude-Michael Comeau
Represented By: Kenyatta Barthelemy
Represented By: Samantha Nicole Bosalavage
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nate Walker
Represented By: Claude-Michael Comeau
Represented By: Kenyatta Barthelemy
Represented By: Samantha Nicole Bosalavage
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrius Williams
Represented By: Claude-Michael Comeau
Represented By: Kenyatta Barthelemy
Represented By: Samantha Nicole Bosalavage
Represented By: Lydia Wright
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Represented By: Andrew Blanchfield
Represented By: Chelsea Acosta Payne
Represented By: Crews Reynolds LeBlanc, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Hooper
Represented By: Andrew Blanchfield
Represented By: Chelsea Acosta Payne
Represented By: Crews Reynolds LeBlanc, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misty Stagg
Represented By: Andrew Blanchfield
Represented By: Chelsea Acosta Payne
Represented By: Crews Reynolds LeBlanc, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Represented By: Andrew Blanchfield
Represented By: Chelsea Acosta Payne
Represented By: Crews Reynolds LeBlanc, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prison Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Blanchfield
Represented By: Chelsea Acosta Payne
Represented By: Crews Reynolds LeBlanc, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?