Parish of Ascension v. Orgeron et al
Plaintiff: Parish of Ascension
Defendant: Corey J. Orgeron
Counter Claimant: Brandee Orgeron
Counter Defendant: Clint Cointment and Patrice Frazier Johnson
Case Number: 3:2023cv01385
Filed: September 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Filing 12 REPLY Memorandum in Support of #6 MOTION to Remand and For Attorney's Fees Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c) filed by Parish of Ascension. (LLH)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. The clerk is directed to file R. Doc. 10-2 into the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 11/6/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
November 3, 2023 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of #6 Motion to Remand by Parish of Ascension (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand)(Brouillette, Donald) Modified on 11/3/2023 to add linkage to document 6. (JEG).
November 3, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
October 30, 2023 Filing 9 First MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #6 MOTION to Remand and For Attorney's Fees Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c) filed by Corey J. Orgeron. (Orgeron, Corey)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Added attorney Donald Stephen Brouillette, Jr. and Jamie Polozola Gomez for Parish of Ascension. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/24/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 24, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Enroll D. Stephen Brouillette, Jr. and Jamie P. Gomez as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (BLR)
October 23, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Enroll D. Stephen Brouillette, Jr. and Jamie P. Gomez as Additional Attorney by Parish of Ascension (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Long, Charles)
October 23, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Remand and For Attorney's Fees Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
October 20, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand and For Attorney's Fees Pursuant to 28 USC 1447(c) by Parish of Ascension (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Motion for Add Time, #3 Exhibit B - Docket Setting)(Brouillette, Donald). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 10/23/2023 (JEG). Modified on 10/23/2023 to edit title of document. (JEG).
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Ex Parte Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. Added attorney Corey John Orgeron for Brandee Orgeron. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/17/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 11, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #3 First MOTION to Enroll COREY J. ORGERON as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
October 5, 2023 Filing 4 RECONVENTIONAL DEMAND AND ANSWER to Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by Brandee Orgeron, Corey J. Orgeron. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit NO OTHER INTERESTED PARTIES, #2 Attachment CIVIL COVER SHEET)(Orgeron, Corey)
October 5, 2023 Filing 3 First MOTION to Enroll COREY J. ORGERON as Attorney by All Defendants (Orgeron, Corey)
September 28, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Pro Se E-Service and E-Notice Consent Form by Corey J. Orgeron. (EDC)
September 28, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ascension Parish Court, Case Number 2023-412. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 32637 ), filed by Brandee Orgeron, Corey J. Orgeron. (Attachments: #1 List of All Documents Included in the State Court Record, #2 Listing of Counsel of Record, #3 state court records)(EDC) Modified on 9/28/2023 to add payment information. (EDC).
September 28, 2023 ***Set CASE REFERRED Pro Se (non-inmate) Flag (EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parish of Ascension v. Orgeron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parish of Ascension
Represented By: Charles S Long, II
Represented By: Jamie Polozola Gomez
Represented By: Donald Stephen Brouillette, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey J. Orgeron
Represented By: Corey John Orgeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Brandee Orgeron
Represented By: Corey John Orgeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Clint Cointment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Patrice Frazier Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?