United States of America v. Briggs Brothers Enterprises Corporation et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use and benefit of Satco, Inc. and United States of America
Defendant: Briggs Brothers Enterprises Corporation and RLI Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2023cv01411
Filed: October 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2023 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons by RLI Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent RLI Corp., Affiliate/Interested Person BlackRock, Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person The Vanguard Group, Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person State Street Corp., Affiliate/Interested Person Terry Briggs, Affiliate/Interested Person Shawna Briggs, Affiliate/Interested Person United States of America for the use and benefit of Satco, Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person Briggs Brothers Enterprises Corporation, Affiliate/Interested Person Satco, Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person RLI Insurance Company for RLI Insurance Company.. (Catalano, Frank)
November 2, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by RLI Insurance Company.(Catalano, Frank)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2024 at 02:00 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 12/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/31/2023. (BLR)
October 27, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Briggs Brothers Enterprises Corporation served on 10/25/2023, answer due 11/15/2023. (Vicknair, Andrew)
October 27, 2023 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. RLI Insurance Company served on 10/9/2023, answer due 10/30/2023. (Vicknair, Andrew)
October 19, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Briggs Brothers Enterprises Corporation. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (EDC)
October 18, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Submitted as to Briggs Brothers Enterprises Corporation through Louisiana Secretary of State (Vicknair, Andrew) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/19/2023) (EDC). Modified on 10/19/2023 to flatten document. (EDC).
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 MOTION to Supplement filed by United States of America for the use and benefit of Satco, Inc. The clerk is directed to attach Exhibit A and B to the #1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 10/4/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
October 4, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Supplement/for Leave to File Exhibit A and Exhibit B to Complaint (Rec Doc 1) . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
October 3, 2023 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by United States of America identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Satco, Inc., Affiliate/Interested Person Waskey Services, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Waskey Holding, LLC for United States of America. (Vicknair, Andrew)
October 3, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Supplement by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Correspondence and enclosures, #3 Exhibit B - Correspondence and enclosures)(Robinson, Ashley) (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/4/2023) (EDC). Modified on 10/4/2023 to rotate pages. (EDC). Modified on 10/4/2023 to edit text. (EDC). Modified to edit text on 10/4/2023 (BLR).
October 3, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Briggs Brothers Enterprises Corporation, RLI Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (LLH)
October 3, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #1 Complaint. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. OR Failure to add all listed interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (LLH)
October 3, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Submitted as to RLI Insurance Company (Vicknair, Andrew)
October 3, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Submitted as to Briggs Brothers Enterprises Corporation (Vicknair, Andrew)
October 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Briggs Brothers Enterprises Corporation, RLI Insurance Company, filed by United States of America for the use and benefit of Satco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vicknair, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2023 Per Order #8: #2 Exhibit A - Correspondence and Enclosure, #3 Exhibit B - Correspondence and Enclosure) (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Briggs Brothers Enterprises Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the use and benefit of Satco, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G. Vicknair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Andrew G. Vicknair
Represented By: Ashley Brooke Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briggs Brothers Enterprises Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLI Insurance Company
Represented By: Frank J. Catalano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?