Robertson et al v. Louisiana Board of Pardons et al
Plaintiff: Allen Robertson, Jr, Anthony Bell, Daniel Joseph Blank, Scott Bourque, David Bowie, Quincy Broaden, Henri Broadway, David Brown, Jeffrey C Clark, Clark Sedwric, Nathaniel Robert Code, Jr., Michael Cooks, James Copeland, Frank Cosey, Kevin Daigle, Percy Davis, Curtis Deal, Clifford Deruise, Felton Dorsey, Darryl Draughn, Jimmy Duncan, James Dunn, Winthrop Eaton, Antoinette Frank, Cedric Edwards, Michael Garcia, Bobby Hampton, Clarence Harris, Jessie Hoffman, Dacarius Holliday, Danny Irish, Kyle David Joekel, Tracy Lee, Julius Lucky, Jeremiah Manning, Jesse Montejo, Lee Roy Odenbaugh, Manuel Ortiz, Marcus Reed, Larry Roy, Christopher Sepulvado, Willie Tart, Antoine Tate, Emmett Taylor, Michael Taylor, Lamondre Tucker, James Tyler, Todd Wessinger, Donald Wright, Donald Leger, Glynn Juniors, Allen Robertson, Daniel Blank, Jeffrey Clark, Sedwric Clark, Nathaniel Code, Daniel Irish, Kyle Joekel, LaDerrick Campbell and Gregory Brown
Defendant: Gregory C Brown, Lederrick Campbell, Louisiana Board of Pardons, Sheryl Ranatza, Curtis Fremin, Jr., Alvin Roche, Jr., Anthony J. Marabella, Bonnie F Jackson, Curtis Fremin, Alvin Roche, Anthony Marabella and Bonnie Jackson
Petitioner: Jason Reeves
Not Classified By Court: Shawn Nolan
Case Number: 3:2023cv01494
Filed: October 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: Shelly D Dick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (EDC)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER of DISMISSAL: The above-captioned and entitled action brought by Plaintiffs, Allen Robertson, Anthony Bell; Daniel Blank; Scott Bourque; David Bowie; Quincy Broaden; Henri Broadway; David Brown; Gregory Brown; Laderrick Campbell; Jeffrey Clark; Sedwric Clark; Nathaniel Code; Michael Cooks; James Copeland; Frank Cosey; Kevin Daigle; Percy Davis; Curtis Deal; Clifford Deruise, Felton Dorsey; Darrell Draughn; Jimmy Duncan; James Dunn; Winthrop Eaton; Cedric Edwards; Antoinette Frank, Michael Garcia; Bobby Hampton; Clarence Harris; Jessie Hoffman; Dacarius Holliday; Daniel Irish, Kyle Joekel; Glynn Juniors; Tracy Lee; Donald Leger; Julius Lucky; Jeremiah Manning; Jesse Montejo; Lee Roy Odenbaugh; Manuel Ortiz; Marcus Reed; Jason Reeves; Larry Roy; Chris Sepulvado; Willie Tart; Antoine Tate; Emmett Taylor, Michael Taylor; Lamondre Tucker; James Tyler; Todd Wessinger; and Donald Wright, against Defendants, is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/27/2023. (EDC)
November 22, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anthony Bell, Daniel Blank, Scott Bourque, David Bowie, Quincy Broaden, Henri Broadway, David Brown, Gregory Brown, LaDerrick Campbell, Jeffrey Clark, Sedwric Clark, Nathaniel Code, Michael Cooks, James Copeland, Frank Cosey, Kevin Daigle, Percy Davis, Curtis Deal, Clifford Deruise, Felton Dorsey, Darryl Draughn, Jimmy Duncan, James Dunn, Winthrop Eaton, Cedric Edwards, Antoinette Frank, Michael Garcia, Bobby Hampton, Clarence Harris, Jessie Hoffman, Dacarius Holliday, Daniel Irish, Kyle Joekel, Glynn Juniors, Tracy Lee, Donald Leger, Julius Lucky, Jeremiah Manning, Jesse Montejo, Shawn Nolan, Lee Roy Odenbaugh, Manuel Ortiz, Marcus Reed, Jason Reeves, Allen Robertson, Larry Roy, Christopher Sepulvado, Willie Tart, Antoine Tate, Emmett Taylor, Michael Taylor, Lamondre Tucker, James Tyler, Todd Wessinger, Donald Wright (Gisleson, Soren)
November 9, 2023 Filing 35 12(B)(6) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 12(B)(7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join Indispensable Party, and 12(B)(1) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by Louisiana Board of Pardons, Sheryl Ranatza, Curtis Fremin, Alvin Roche, Anthony Marabella, and Bonnie Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memo in Support)(LLH)
November 9, 2023 Filing 34 RULING denying #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/9/2023. (SWE)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/9/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
November 9, 2023 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Defendants 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 12(b)(7) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join an Indispensable Party, and 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing, #2 Proposed Pleading; Memorandum in Support of Defendants 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 12(b)(7) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Join an Indispensable Party, and 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing, #3 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Arcuri, Blake)
November 6, 2023 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #30 MOTION to Dismiss , or Alternatively, Motion to Quash Returns of Service of Process Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5) filed by Todd Wessinger. (Gisleson, Soren)
November 3, 2023 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss , or Alternatively, Motion to Quash Returns of Service of Process Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(5) by Sheryl Ranatza, Alvin Roche (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support)(Arcuri, Blake). Added MOTION to Quash on 11/6/2023 (NLT).
November 3, 2023 Filing 29 REPLY Memorandum in Support of #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Anthony Bell, Daniel Blank, Scott Bourque, David Bowie, Quincy Broaden, Henri Broadway, David Brown, Gregory Brown, LaDerrick Campbell, Jeffrey Clark, Sedwric Clark, Nathaniel Code, Michael Cooks, James Copeland, Frank Cosey, Kevin Daigle, Percy Davis, Curtis Deal, Clifford Deruise, Felton Dorsey, Darryl Draughn, Jimmy Duncan, James Dunn, Winthrop Eaton, Cedric Edwards, Antoinette Frank, Michael Garcia, Bobby Hampton, Clarence Harris, Jessie Hoffman, Dacarius Holliday, Daniel Irish, Kyle Joekel, Glynn Juniors, Tracy Lee, Julius Lucky, Jeremiah Manning, Jesse Montejo, Lee Roy Odenbaugh, Manuel Ortiz, Marcus Reed, Allen Robertson, Larry Roy, Christopher Sepulvado, Willie Tart, Antoine Tate, Emmett Taylor, Michael Taylor, Lamondre Tucker, James Tyler, Todd Wessinger, Donald Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Clemency for Capital Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Capital Cases, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter)(LLH)
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Todd Wessinger. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 11/3/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
November 3, 2023 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Todd Wessinger (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; with Exhibits 1-3)(Gisleson, Soren)
November 2, 2023 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Persons by Curtis Fremin, Bonnie Jackson, Louisiana Board of Pardons, Anthony Marabella, Sheryl Ranatza, Alvin Roche identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Laura C. Rodrigue, Affiliate/Interested Person Blake J. Arcuri, Affiliate/Interested Person Soren Erik Gisleson, Affiliate/Interested Person Shawn Nolan, Affiliate/Interested Person Aaron Novod, Affiliate/Interested Person Nicholas Trenticosta, Affiliate/Interested Person Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel, Affiliate/Interested Person John Neeleman, Affiliate/Interested Person Sarah Ottinger, Affiliate/Interested Person Matilde Jean Carbia, Affiliate/Interested Person Letty DiGiulio for Alvin Roche, Anthony Marabella, Bonnie Jackson, Curtis Fremin, Louisiana Board of Pardons, Sheryl Ranatza. (Rodrigue, Laura)
November 2, 2023 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter by Sheryl Ranatza, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Francis Abbott, #3 Exhibit AG Opinion)(Arcuri, Blake)
October 30, 2023 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Wessinger. Sheryl Ranatza served on 10/24/2023, answer due 11/14/2023. (Gisleson, Soren) (Main Document 24 replaced on 11/1/2023) (EDC). Modified on 11/1/2023 to rotate pages. (EDC).
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #18 Motion Request for Status Conference, without prejudice to re-urging after the expiration of the briefing deadline 6 . Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/26/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Dick, Shelly)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Shawn Nolan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Co-Plaintiff James Tyler. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 10/24/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)ATTENTION: Local counsel shall provide the following link to those attorneys granted leave to proceed pro hac vice in the Middle District of Louisiana who choose to register for e-file access #www.lamd.uscourts.gov/pro-hac-vice-e-filing-registration. Modified on 10/24/2023 to edit text (LLH).
October 24, 2023 Filing 21 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Jeff Landry. The named person/entity is not reflected on the docket sheet as a party in the case. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (JEG)
October 23, 2023 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Wessinger. Alvin Roche served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (Gisleson, Soren)
October 23, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Wessinger. Sheryl Ranatza served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (Gisleson, Soren)
October 23, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Status and Request for Status Conference on behalf of all plaintiffs by Todd Wessinger (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (10/19/2023 Minute Entry))(Gisleson, Soren) Modified on 10/24/2023 to reflect event as motion (JEG).
October 23, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Wessinger. Curtis Fremin served on 10/20/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (Gisleson, Soren)
October 23, 2023 Filing 16 Summons Submitted as to Attorney General, Jeff Landry (Gisleson, Soren)
October 23, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Shawn Nolan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2655629). This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (JEG)
October 20, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Shawn Nolan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $100.00, Receipt Number ALAMDC-2655629) by James Tyler (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration & Certificate, #2 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Gisleson, Soren)
October 20, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #10 Certificate of Interested Persons. Failure to add all listed interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (JEG)
October 20, 2023 *** Add Interested Person by Todd Wessinger identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Attorney General Jeff Landry for Todd Wessinger. (Gisleson, Soren)
October 19, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Irish, Dacarius Holliday, Felton Dorsey, Glynn Juniors, Henri Broadway, Antoinette Frank, Shawn Nolan, Kevin Daigle, Anthony Bell, Allen Robertson, Percy Davis, Gregory Brown, Clarence Harris, Frank Cosey, Jason Reeves, Cedric Edwards, Winthrop Eaton, Michael Garcia, Jesse Montejo, Clifford Deruise, Michael Cooks, Emmett Taylor, James Dunn, Jessie Hoffman, Jeffrey Clark, Todd Wessinger, Antoine Tate, Manuel Ortiz, Darryl Draughn, Christopher Sepulvado, Nathaniel Code, Jimmy Duncan, Bobby Hampton, Quincy Broaden, Michael Taylor, Jeremiah Manning, Tracy Lee, Daniel Blank, Lamondre Tucker, LaDerrick Campbell, Lee Roy Odenbaugh, Sedwric Clark, Willie Tart, James Copeland, James Tyler, Julius Lucky, David Brown, Scott Bourque, Kyle Joekel, Larry Roy, Donald Leger, Marcus Reed, Curtis Deal, Donald Wright, David Bowie. Anthony Marabella served on 10/19/2023, answer due 11/9/2023. (Gisleson, Soren)
October 19, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Irish, Dacarius Holliday, Felton Dorsey, Glynn Juniors, Henri Broadway, Antoinette Frank, Shawn Nolan, Kevin Daigle, Anthony Bell, Allen Robertson, Percy Davis, Gregory Brown, Clarence Harris, Frank Cosey, Jason Reeves, Cedric Edwards, Winthrop Eaton, Michael Garcia, Jesse Montejo, Clifford Deruise, Michael Cooks, Emmett Taylor, James Dunn, Jessie Hoffman, Jeffrey Clark, Todd Wessinger, Antoine Tate, Manuel Ortiz, Darryl Draughn, Christopher Sepulvado, Nathaniel Code, Jimmy Duncan, Bobby Hampton, Quincy Broaden, Michael Taylor, Jeremiah Manning, Tracy Lee, Daniel Blank, Lamondre Tucker, LaDerrick Campbell, Lee Roy Odenbaugh, Sedwric Clark, Willie Tart, James Copeland, James Tyler, Julius Lucky, David Brown, Scott Bourque, Kyle Joekel, Larry Roy, Donald Leger, Marcus Reed, Curtis Deal, Donald Wright, David Bowie. Louisiana Board of Pardons served on 10/19/2023, answer due 11/9/2023. (Gisleson, Soren)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Expedited Hearing on #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants shall file a response to the #3 Motion by 11/2/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/19/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
October 19, 2023 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons by Anthony Bell, Daniel Blank, Scott Bourque, David Bowie, Quincy Broaden, Henri Broadway, David Brown, Gregory Brown, LaDerrick Campbell, Jeffrey Clark, Sedwric Clark, Nathaniel Code, Michael Cooks, James Copeland, Frank Cosey, Kevin Daigle, Percy Davis, Curtis Deal, Clifford Deruise, Felton Dorsey, Darryl Draughn, Jimmy Duncan, James Dunn, Winthrop Eaton, Cedric Edwards, Antoinette Frank, Michael Garcia, Bobby Hampton, Clarence Harris, Jessie Hoffman, Dacarius Holliday, Daniel Irish, Kyle Joekel, Glynn Juniors, Tracy Lee, Donald Leger, Julius Lucky, Jeremiah Manning, Jesse Montejo, Shawn Nolan, Lee Roy Odenbaugh, Manuel Ortiz, Marcus Reed, Jason Reeves, Allen Robertson, Larry Roy, Christopher Sepulvado, Willie Tart, Antoine Tate, Emmett Taylor, Michael Taylor, Lamondre Tucker, James Tyler, Todd Wessinger, Donald Wright. (Gisleson, Soren)
October 19, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (JEG)
October 19, 2023 Filing 8 Letter to Attorney Shawn Nolan who is lead counsel for party James Tyler. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (JEG)
October 18, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #1 Complaint. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (JEG)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Replace Pleading by All Plaintiffs. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 10/17/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (Dick, Shelly)
October 17, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION Replace Pleading by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; [3-1])(Gisleson, Soren)
October 17, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Expedited Hearing on #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Gisleson, Soren)
October 17, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1. EBRDA Petition, #3 Exhibit 2. 2023-08-09 Gov LTR to Pardon Board, #4 Exhibit 3. LBP Policy 02-207, #5 Exhibit 4. Schedule, #6 Exhibit 5. Article, #7 Exhibit 6. 8-14-2023 Pardon Board Minutes, #8 Exhibit 7. Article, #9 Exhibit 8. Board Exception, #10 Exhibit 9. Board Mtn to Recuse, #11 Exhibit 10. 2023-09-26 LTR Landry to Smith, #12 Exhibit 11. Notice of Agenda, #13 Exhibit 12. Settlement Agreement, #14 Exhibit 13. Article, #15 Exhibit 14. Opinion 23-0083, #16 Exhibit 15. Article, #17 Exhibit 16. Article, #18 Exhibit 17. 2023-09-26 LTR Smith to AG Landry, #19 Exhibit 18. 2023-09-29 Board Meeting Transcript)(Gisleson, Soren) . Modified on 10/17/2023 to replace memo in support as per Order #5 (LLH).
October 17, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Submitted as to Louisiana Pardon Board, Fremin, Jackson, Marabella, Roche' and Ranatza (Attachments: #1 Summons Fremin, #2 Summons Jackson, #3 Summons Marabella, #4 Summons Roche', #5 Summons Ranatza)(Gisleson, Soren)
October 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Curtis Fremin, Jr., Bonnie F Jackson, Louisiana Board of Pardons, Anthony J. Marabella, Sheryl Ranatza, Alvin Roche, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2653053.), filed by Danny Irish, Dacarius Holliday, Felton Dorsey, Henri Broadway, Antoinette Frank, Kevin Daigle, Anthony Bell, Allen Robertson, Jr., Percy Davis, Clarence Harris, Frank Cosey, Cedric Edwards, Winthrop Eaton, Michael Garcia, Jesse Montejo, Michael Cooks, Clifford Deruise, Emmett Taylor, James Dunn, Jessie Hoffman, Jeffrey C Clark, Todd Wessinger, Antoine Tate, Manuel Ortiz, Darryl Draughn, Christopher Sepulvado, Nathaniel Robert Code, Jr., Jimmy Duncan, Bobby Hampton, Quincy Broaden, Michael Taylor, Jeremiah Manning, Daniel Joseph Blank, Tracy Lee, Lamondre Tucker, Clark Sedwric, Lee Roy Odenbaugh, Willie Tart, James Copeland, James Tyler, Julius Lucky, David Brown, Scott Bourque, Kyle David Joekel, Larry Roy, Donald Leger, Marcus Reed, Curtis Deal, Donald Wright, David Bowie, LaDerrick Campbell, Gregory Brown, Glynn Juniors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. EBRDA Petition, #2 Exhibit 2. 2023-08-09 Gov LTR to Pardon Board, #3 Exhibit 3. LBP Policy 02-207, #4 Exhibit 4. Full Schedule, #5 Exhibit 5. Article, #6 Exhibit 6. 8-14-2023 Board Minutes, #7 Exhibit 7. Article, #8 Exhibit 8. Board Exception No Cause, #9 Exhibit 9. Board Mtn to Recuse, #10 Exhibit 10. 9-26-2023 LTR Landry to Smith, #11 Exhibit 11. Notice and Agenda, #12 Exhibit 12. Settlement Agreement, #13 Exhibit 13. Article, #14 Exhibit 14. Opinion 23-0083, #15 Exhibit 15. Article, #16 Exhibit 16. Article, #17 Exhibit 17. 9-26-2023 LTR Smith to AG Landry, #18 Exhibit 18. 9-29-2023 Board Meeting Transcript, #19 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gisleson, Soren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson et al v. Louisiana Board of Pardons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Robertson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Bell
Represented By: David Aaron Novod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Joseph Blank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Bourque
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bowie
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincy Broaden
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henri Broadway
Represented By: Sarah L. Ottinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brown
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey C Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark Sedwric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Robert Code, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cooks
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Copeland
Represented By: Nicholas J. Trenticosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Cosey
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Daigle
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Percy Davis
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Deal
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Deruise
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felton Dorsey
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Draughn
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Duncan
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dunn
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winthrop Eaton
Represented By: Nicholas J. Trenticosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Frank
Represented By: Letty S. Di Giulio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric Edwards
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Garcia
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Hampton
Represented By: Letty S. Di Giulio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Harris
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Hoffman
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Represented By: Sarah L. Ottinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dacarius Holliday
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Irish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle David Joekel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Lee
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Lucky
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Manning
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Montejo
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Roy Odenbaugh
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Ortiz
Represented By: David Aaron Novod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Reed
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Roy
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sepulvado
Represented By: David Aaron Novod
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Tart
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Tate
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmett Taylor
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Taylor
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamondre Tucker
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Tyler
Represented By: Soren E. Gisleson
Represented By: Shawn Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Wessinger
Represented By: Soren E. Gisleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Wright
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Leger
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glynn Juniors
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Robertson
Represented By: David Aaron Novod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Blank
Represented By: Letty S. Di Giulio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Clark
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sedwric Clark
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Code
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Irish
Represented By: David Aaron Novod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Joekel
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaDerrick Campbell
Represented By: Matilde Jean Carbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Brown
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory C Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lederrick Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Board of Pardons
Represented By: Laura Cannizzaro Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Ranatza
Represented By: Laura Cannizzaro Rodrigue
Represented By: Blake J Arcuri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Fremin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Roche, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Marabella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie F Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Fremin
Represented By: Blake J Arcuri
Represented By: Laura Cannizzaro Rodrigue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Roche
Represented By: Blake J Arcuri
Represented By: Laura Cannizzaro Rodrigue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Marabella
Represented By: Blake J Arcuri
Represented By: Laura Cannizzaro Rodrigue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Jackson
Represented By: Blake J Arcuri
Represented By: Laura Cannizzaro Rodrigue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Shawn Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?