Mealey et al v. City of Baton Rouge / Parish of East Baton Rouge et al
Plaintiff: Carrie Mealey and Houston Lawrence
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge, Troy Lawrence, Jr., Murphy J. Paul, Jr., Sid J. Gautreaux, III, Chad Felps, Tanner Jenkins, Eno Guillot, James Cooper, N. Dartez, Benchmark Group, LLC, Tafari Beard, Doe Defendants 1-10, ABC Insurance Companies 1-10, City of Baton Rouge / Parish of East Baton Rouge, Murphy Paul and Doe Defendants 1-20
Case Number: 3:2023cv01508
Filed: October 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Brian A Jackson
Referring Judge: Scott D Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #13 Ex Parte MOTION for William Most and David Lanser to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants, Sid J. Gautreaux, III, Sheriff of East Baton Rouge Parish, Chad Felps, Tanner Jenkins, Eno Guillot, James Cooper, and N. Dartez, now has until January 18, 2024, to file responsive pleadings to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 12/13/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
December 13, 2023 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Persons by James Cooper, N. Dartez, Chad Felps, Sid J. Gautreaux, III, Eno Guillot, Tanner Jenkins identifying Corporate Parent American Alternative Insurance Corporation, Affiliate/Interested Person Sid J. Gautreaux, Affiliate/Interested Person Tanner Jenkins, Affiliate/Interested Person Eno Guillot, Affiliate/Interested Person Chad Felps, Affiliate/Interested Person N. Dartez, Affiliate/Interested Person James Cooper for Chad Felps, Eno Guillot, James Cooper, N. Dartez, Sid J. Gautreaux III, Tanner Jenkins.. (St. Pierre, Catherine) (Main Document 15 replaced on 12/14/2023) (ELW). Modified on 12/14/2023 to flatten document (ELW).
December 13, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer,. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. OR Failure to add all listed interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (LLH)
December 13, 2023 Filing 13 Ex Parte MOTION for William Most and David Lanser to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Most, William)
December 13, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
December 12, 2023 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Complaint by James Cooper, N. Dartez, Chad Felps, Sid J. Gautreaux, III, Eno Guillot, Tanner Jenkins (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(St. Pierre, Catherine)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Enroll as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 11/8/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH)
November 8, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #9 MOTION to Enroll Michael S. Walsh as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
November 7, 2023 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons by Murphy Paul. (Walsh, Michael)
November 6, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Enroll Michael S. Walsh as Attorney by Murphy Paul (Walsh, Michael)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2024 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 1/18/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 10/27/2023. (KAH)
October 23, 2023 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons by Houston Lawrence, Carrie Mealey identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Sid J. Gautreaux, Affiliate/Interested Person East Baton Rouge Sheriff's Office, Affiliate/Interested Person Tanner Jenkins, Affiliate/Interested Person Murphy Law Firm, Affiliate/Interested Person Murphy Paul, Affiliate/Interested Person Benchmark Group, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person City of Baton Rouge, Affiliate/Interested Person Troy Lawrence, Affiliate/Interested Person James Cooper, Affiliate/Interested Person Eno Guillot, Affiliate/Interested Person Most & Associates, Affiliate/Interested Person Carrie Mealey, Affiliate/Interested Person Houston Lawrence, Affiliate/Interested Person Chad Felps, Affiliate/Interested Person N. Dartez, Affiliate/Interested Person Tafari Beard, Affiliate/Interested Person City of Baton Rouge Department of Risk Management, Affiliate/Interested Person Erlingson Banks PLLC, Affiliate/Interested Person East Baton Rouge Parish Attorneys Office for Carrie Mealey, Houston Lawrence. (Lanser, David)
October 20, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Murphy Paul. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
October 20, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Murphy Paul. The named person/entity is not reflected on the docket sheet as a party in the case. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (ELW)
October 20, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Tafari Beard, Benchmark Group, LLC, City of Baton Rouge, James Cooper, N. Dartez, Chad Felps, Sid J. Gautreaux, III, Eno Guillot, Tanner Jenkins, Troy Lawrence, Jr.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
October 20, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #1 Complaint. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. OR Failure to add all listed interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (ELW)
October 18, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Submitted as to City of New Orleans, Troy Lawrence Jr., Murphy Paul, Sid J. Gautreaux III, Chad Felps, Tanner Jenkins, Eno Guillot, James Cooper, N. Dartez, Benchmark Group, LLC, Tafari Beard (Attachments: #1 Attachment Gautreaux Summons, #2 Attachment Beard Summons, #3 Attachment Benchmark Summons, #4 Attachment Cooper Summons, #5 Attachment Dartez Summons, #6 Attachment Felps Summons, #7 Attachment Guillot Summons, #8 Attachment Paul Summons, #9 Attachment Lawrence Summons, #10 Attachment Jenkins Summons)(Lanser, David)
October 18, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2654284.), filed by Houston Lawrence, Carrie Mealey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Most, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mealey et al v. City of Baton Rouge / Parish of East Baton Rouge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Mealey
Represented By: William Brock Most
Represented By: David Joseph Lanser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Lawrence
Represented By: William Brock Most
Represented By: David Joseph Lanser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Lawrence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy J. Paul, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sid J. Gautreaux, III
Represented By: Mary G. Erlingson
Represented By: Catherine S. St. Pierre
Represented By: London Breanna Smith
Represented By: Tara Lynn Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Felps
Represented By: Mary G. Erlingson
Represented By: Catherine S. St. Pierre
Represented By: London Breanna Smith
Represented By: Tara Lynn Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanner Jenkins
Represented By: Catherine S. St. Pierre
Represented By: London Breanna Smith
Represented By: Mary G. Erlingson
Represented By: Tara Lynn Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eno Guillot
Represented By: Mary G. Erlingson
Represented By: Catherine S. St. Pierre
Represented By: London Breanna Smith
Represented By: Tara Lynn Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cooper
Represented By: Catherine S. St. Pierre
Represented By: Mary G. Erlingson
Represented By: London Breanna Smith
Represented By: Tara Lynn Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Dartez
Represented By: London Breanna Smith
Represented By: Tara Lynn Johnston
Represented By: Mary G. Erlingson
Represented By: Catherine S. St. Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benchmark Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tafari Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge / Parish of East Baton Rouge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Paul
Represented By: Michael Sean Walsh
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Represented By: Gillian Bernice Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?