McClarty v. City of Baton Rouge et al
Plaintiff: Vladimir McClarty
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge, Troy Lawrence, Jr., James Thomas, Jr, David Kennedy, Jesse Barcelona, Myron Daniels, Murphy Paul, Doe Defendants 1-20 and ABC Insurance Companies 1-10
Case Number: 3:2023cv01619
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record. Added attorney Ashley J. McCullen for Myron Daniels. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 1/2/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Enroll Ashley J. McCullen as Additional Attorney by Myron Daniels (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order)(Adams, Michael)
December 28, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #11 MOTION to Enroll Ashley J. McCullen as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. Added attorneys Michael R. D. Adams, Brandon DeCuir, Monica E. Gant and Corey Lamar Pierce for Myron Daniels. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/27/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 27, 2023 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons by Myron Daniels identifying Affiliate/Interested Person ABC Insurance Companies 1-10, Affiliate/Interested Person David Kennedy, Affiliate/Interested Person Jesse Barcelona, Affiliate/Interested Person Murphy Paul, Affiliate/Interested Person Decuir, Clark & Adams, LLP, Affiliate/Interested Person Doe Defendants 1-20, Affiliate/Interested Person Troy Lawrence, Jr., Affiliate/Interested Person City of Baton Rouge, Affiliate/Interested Person Myron Daniels, Affiliate/Interested Person James Thomas for Myron Daniels.. (EDC)
December 27, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Enroll Michael R. D. Adams, Brandon J. DeCuir, Monica Gant Moton and Corey L. Pierce as Attorney by Myron Daniels (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order, #2 Attachment Certificate of Interested Persons)(Adams, Michael)
December 27, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Enroll Michael R. D. Adams, Brandon J. DeCuir, Monica Gant Moton and Corey L. Pierce as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/7/2024 at 08:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 2/22/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/18/2023. (BLR)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Enroll Counsel of Record. Added attorney Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.,Michael Sean Walsh,Gillian Bernice Griffin for Murphy Paul. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 12/18/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
December 15, 2023 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Murphy Paul. (Walsh, Michael)
December 15, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Enroll Michael S. Walsh, Harry J. Phillips, Jr, and Gillian B. Griffin as Attorney by Murphy Paul (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Walsh, Michael) Modified on 12/15/2023 to edit text (LLH).
December 15, 2023 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Enroll Michael S. Walsh, Harry J. Phillips, Jr, and Gillian B. Griffin. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LLH)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Vladimir McClarty identifying Corporate Parent Sid Gautreaux, Affiliate/Interested Person Sid Gautreaux III, Affiliate/Interested Person David Kennedy, Affiliate/Interested Person Jesse Barcelona, Affiliate/Interested Person Murphy Paul, Affiliate/Interested Person Troy Lawrence, Affiliate/Interested Person Most & Associates, Affiliate/Interested Person East Baton Rouge Parish Attorneys Office, Affiliate/Interested Person Vladimir McClarty, Affiliate/Interested Person City of Baton Rouge, Affiliate/Interested Person Myron Daniels, Affiliate/Interested Person East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office, Affiliate/Interested Person James Thomas for Vladimir McClarty. (Lanser, David)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #1 Complaint. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. OR Failure to add all listed interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (ELW)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAMDC-2673271.), filed by Vladimir McClarty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Most, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McClarty v. City of Baton Rouge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir McClarty
Represented By: William Brock Most
Represented By: David Joseph Lanser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Baton Rouge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Lawrence, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Thomas, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Barcelona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myron Daniels
Represented By: Michael R. D. Adams
Represented By: Ashley J. McCullen
Represented By: Brandon DeCuir
Represented By: Corey Lamar Pierce
Represented By: Monica E. Gant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murphy Paul
Represented By: Harry Joseph Philips, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Sean Walsh
Represented By: Gillian Bernice Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?