Butler et al v. Louisiana State Penitentiary et al
Plaintiff: Brandee Butler, Tomeka Robinson and Kalob Jacquet
Defendant: Louisiana State Penitentiary, Dept of Public Safety & Corrections, Louisiana Department of Health, Nicholas Sanders, Amelia Nakanishi, Parish Forensics, LLC, Liz McGraw, State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals, Timothy Hooper, Inmate DOE, CO Doe # 1 and CO Doe # 2
Case Number: 3:2024cv00162
Filed: February 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Shelly D Dick
Referring Judge: Erin Wilder-Doomes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2024 Filing 25 First REPLY in Support of #10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Amelia Nakanishi, Parish Forensics, LLC. (LaCour, Kirk)
April 23, 2024 Filing 24 REPLY in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Timothy Hooper, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals, Louisiana State Penitentiary, Liz McGraw, Nicholas Sanders, State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections. (Blanchfield, Andrew)
April 9, 2024 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kalob Jacquet. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Opposition, #2 Exhibit List Plaintiff, #3 Exhibit A - Facsimile Transmittal Sheet/ Fax Confirmation date, #4 Exhibit B- Fax Confirmation from Clerk of Court, #5 Exhibit C- La. R.S. 13:850 Facsimile Transmission)(LLH)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File opposition to defendants MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/9/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
April 8, 2024 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File unopposed Motion for Leave of Court to opposition to defendants Motion to dismiss by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Memorandum in support of Plaintiffs' unopposed Motion for Leave, #2 Attachment Plaintiff opposition for defendant Motion to dismiss, #3 Exhibit List Plaintiff Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff Exhibit A - Facsimile Transmittal Sheet/ Fax Confirmation dated 1/12/2024, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff Exhibit B- Fax Confirmation from Clerk of Court, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff Exhibit C- La. R.S. 13:850 Facsimile Transmission)(Obioha, Pius)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER : #18 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss is denied for Plaintiffs' failure to provide a reason for the untimeliness and failure to consult with Defendants. The Motion is denied without prejudice to re-filing. Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 4/8/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SWE)
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2024 at 09:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes. Status Report due by 5/23/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 4/3/2024. (BLR)
April 2, 2024 Filing 18 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of motion for leave, #2 Proposed Pleading; Plaintiff Opposition to Defendants Motion to dismiss, #3 Exhibit List Plaintiff exhibit list, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A- Facsimile Transmittal Sheet, #5 Exhibit exhibit B-Fax Confirmation, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C-Louisiana Law)(Obioha, Pius)
April 1, 2024 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim First MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List exhibit list, #2 Exhibit exhibit A- Fax file Confirmation 1/12/2024, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B- Fax Confirmation from Clerk of Court, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C- Facsimile transmission Law)(Obioha, Pius)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Strike R. Doc. 13 Certificate of Interested Persons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/22/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
March 22, 2024 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #15 First MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 13. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
March 21, 2024 Filing 15 First MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 13 by Amelia Nakanishi, Parish Forensics, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(LaCour, Kirk)
March 20, 2024 Filing 14 Amended Certificate of Interested Persons by Amelia Nakanishi, Parish Forensics, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Beazley Group Limited, Corporate Parent Parish Forensics, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Amelia Nakanishi, Affiliate/Interested Person Roy B Provost, Affiliate/Interested Person Amy Doerle Provost for Amelia Nakanishi, Parish Forensics, LLC.. (LaCour, Kirk) (Main Document 14 replaced on 3/21/2024) (EDC). Modified on 3/21/2024 to flatten document. (EDC). Modified on 3/21/2024 to edit text.(EDC).
March 20, 2024 Filing 13 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD Certificate of Interested Persons by Parish Forensics, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Parish Forensics, LLC, Affiliate/Interested Person Beazley Group Limited, Affiliate/Interested Person Roy B Provost, Affiliate/Interested Person Amy Doerle Provost for Parish Forensics, LLC.. (LaCour, Kirk) Modified on 3/22/2024 to remove document as it has been stricken by Order #16 (LLH).
March 20, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion for More Definite Statement. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons. REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (EDC)
March 19, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parish Forensics, LLC. (EDC)
March 19, 2024 Filing 10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , First MOTION for More Definite Statement by Amelia Nakanishi, Parish Forensics, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(LaCour, Kirk)
March 19, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Removal Notice of Consent and Joinder to Removal by State of Louisiana filed by Amelia Nakanishi, Parish Forensics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Corporate Disclosure, #2 Attachment Notice of Compliance, #3 Attachment Notice to Adverse Party)(LaCour, Kirk) Modified on 3/20/2024 to edit text. (EDC).
March 6, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Timothy Hooper, Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals, Louisiana State Penitentiary, Liz McGraw, Nicholas Sanders, State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support, #2 Attachment Proposed Order)(Blanchfield, Andrew)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal. The clerk is directed to replace R. Doc. 1 with R. Doc. 6-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 3/1/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (BLR)
February 29, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal by Timothy Hooper, Louisiana Department of Health, Louisiana State Penitentiary, Liz McGraw, Dept of Public Safety & Corrections, Nicholas Sanders (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Substituted Notice of Removal)(Blanchfield, Andrew)
February 29, 2024 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Substitute Notice of Removal . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (EDC)
February 28, 2024 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Louisiana Department of Health, Louisiana State Penitentiary, Liz McGraw, Dept of Public Safety & Corrections, Nicholas Sanders identifying Affiliate/Interested Person Liz McGraw for Dept of Public Safety & Corrections, Liz McGraw, Louisiana State Penitentiary; Affiliate/Interested Person Nicholas Sanders for Nicholas Sanders; Affiliate/Interested Person Department Health and Hospitals for Louisiana Department of Health. (Blanchfield, Andrew)
February 28, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #1 Notice of Removal. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. (EDC)
February 28, 2024 Filing 3 Letter to Attorney Pius Akamdi Obioha regarding Joseh R. Barbie, Sr. who is Co-Counsel for parties Brandee Butler, Tomeka Robinson and Kalob Jacquet. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC)
February 28, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Compliance by Louisiana Department of Health, Louisiana State Penitentiary, Liz McGraw, Dept of Public Safety & Corrections, Nicholas Sanders to #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Attachment Addendum A - State Court Record)(Blanchfield, Andrew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/28/2024) (EDC). Modified on 2/28/2024 to rotate pages. (EDC).
February 28, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial District Court, West Feliciana Parish, Case Number 24816. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAMDC-2719551), filed by Louisiana Department of Health, Nicholas Sanders, Louisiana State Penitentiary, Liz McGraw, Dept of Public Safety & Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Notice to Adverse Party of Removal, #3 Attachment Addendum A - State Court Record)(Blanchfield, Andrew) (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/28/2024) (EDC). Modified on 2/28/2024 to rotate pages. (EDC). Modified on 3/4/2024 to replace document as per Order #7 (LLH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler et al v. Louisiana State Penitentiary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandee Butler
Represented By: Pius Akamdi Obioha
Represented By: Pius A Obioha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomeka Robinson
Represented By: Pius Akamdi Obioha
Represented By: Pius A Obioha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kalob Jacquet
Represented By: Pius Akamdi Obioha
Represented By: Pius A Obioha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State Penitentiary
Represented By: Chelsea Acosta Payne
Represented By: Andrew Blanchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of Public Safety & Corrections
Represented By: Chelsea Acosta Payne
Represented By: Andrew Blanchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Health
Represented By: Andrew Blanchfield
Represented By: Chelsea Acosta Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Sanders
Represented By: Andrew Blanchfield
Represented By: Chelsea Acosta Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amelia Nakanishi
Represented By: Kirk Patrick LaCour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parish Forensics, LLC
Represented By: Kirk Patrick LaCour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz McGraw
Represented By: Chelsea Acosta Payne
Represented By: Andrew Blanchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Represented By: Andrew Blanchfield
Represented By: Chelsea Acosta Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals
Represented By: Andrew Blanchfield
Represented By: Chelsea Acosta Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Hooper
Represented By: Andrew Blanchfield
Represented By: Chelsea Acosta Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmate DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Doe # 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Doe # 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?