Jones v. Department of Health
Plaintiff: Paul C. Jones
Defendant: Department of Health, Eastern Louisiana Mental Health Systems, Turn Key Health, Bureau of Protective Services, Rebekah Gee, Laura Lott, Unknown Lieutenant, Tunsha Harris, Unknown Kelly, Pamela Scott, Richard B., Chris Braggs, John Roberts, III, Unknown Nurse Director, Unknown Brown and Jon Echols
Case Number: 3:2024cv00178
Filed: March 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard L Bourgeois
Referring Judge: John W deGravelles
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Plead. Defendants Unknown Brown and Turn Key Health are granted an extension of time until 5/10/2024 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 4/23/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO)
April 22, 2024 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Persons by Unknown Brown, Turn Key Health (Hellmers, Carl)
April 22, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY with LR 7.1 as to #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Failure to file a Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall file a Certificate of Interested Persons and the interested persons shall be added to CM/ECF by the filer using the event Certificate of Interested Persons. OR Failure to add all listed interested persons to CM/ECF upon filing of Certificate of Interested Persons REQUIRED CORRECTION: Within one business day, the filer shall add all interested persons listed on the certificate using the event Add Interested Person located under Notices in the CM/ECF system. (ELW)
April 22, 2024 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time Within Which To Plead on Behalf of Turn Key Health Clinic. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW)
April 19, 2024 Filing 6 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time Within Which To Plead on Behalf of Turn Key Health Clinic by Turn Key Health (Attachments: #1 Order to Motion for Extension)(Hellmers, Carl) Modified on 4/23/2024 to edit event type (SGO).
March 28, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Paul C. Jones (NLT)
March 12, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Richard B., Chris Braggs, Unknown Brown, Bureau of Protective Services, Department of Health, Eastern Louisiana Mental Health Systems, Jon Echols, Rebekah Gee, Tunsha Harris, Unknown Lieutenant, Laura Lott, Unknown Nurse Director, John Roberts, III, Pamela Scott. (NOTICE:Plaintiff shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (ELW)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER : The #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk shall file said complaint without prepayment of costs or security thereof and the Clerk is directed to issue process to the defendant(s). The plaintiff(s) is responsible for service of summons and complaint on the defendant(s). Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/11/2024. (ELW)
March 1, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul C. Jones (EDC)
March 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard B., Chris Braggs, Unknown Brown, Bureau of Protective Services, Department of Health, Eastern Louisiana Mental Health Systems, Jon Echols, Rebekah Gee, Tunsha Harris, Unknown Kelly, Unknown Lieutenant, Laura Lott, Unknown Nurse Director, John Roberts, III, Pamela Scott, Turn Key Health, filed by Paul C. Jones.(EDC)
March 1, 2024 MOTION(S) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis. This motion is now pending before the USMJ., ***Set CASE REFERRED Pro Se (non-inmate) Flag (EDC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Department of Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul C. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastern Louisiana Mental Health Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Health
Represented By: Carl E. Hellmers, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Protective Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebekah Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Lieutenant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tunsha Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Braggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roberts, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nurse Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Brown
Represented By: Carl E. Hellmers, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?