Card v. Keffer et al

Plaintiff: Charles Card
Defendant: Joe Keffer, S Smith, B Bacon, J Alexandre and A Molina
Case Number: 1:2010cv01195
Filed: July 13, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2013 193 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING ; Report and Recommendations re 184 Report and Recommendations, denying 171 Motion for Reconsideration.. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 1/16/13. (crt,Roaix, G)
November 30, 2011 161 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 137 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that defendants' motion for summary judgment 14 is GRANTED in favor of defendant's Keffer, Molina and Alexandre, and that Card's action is DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 11/29/11. (crt,Roaix, G)
October 20, 2011 149 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 137 Report and Recommendations of the magistrate judge. ORDERED 14 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in favor of defendants Keffer, Molina and Alexandre and Card's action is DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 10/20/2011. (crt,Leleux, M)
October 11, 2011 141 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 137 Report and Recommendations of the magistrate judge. The 14 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Andres Molina Ossers, Belinda Bacon, Joel Alexandre, Joe Keffer, Spencer Smith is GRANTED IN PART in favor of Smith and Bacon. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 10/11/2011. (crt,Leleux, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Card v. Keffer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Card
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Keffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Alexandre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?