Whitley v. Sherrod

Plaintiff: Major Boyd Whitley
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2010cv01921
Filed: December 29, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT adopting Report and Recommendations re 72 Report and Recommendations, granting 50 Motion for Summary Judgment and Whitely's action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 2/1/13. (crt,Roaix, G)
July 13, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 42 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's appeal is GRANTED insofar as plaintiff's complaint is deemed amended in order t o substitute defendants N.P. Paul Nordstrom and R.N. Marcus Wallace in place of previously unidentified John Doe defendants. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff's appeal is DENIED in all other respects and no further amendment is to be affected by this order. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 7/13/2012. (crt,Haik, K)
January 30, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 29 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss 23 is GRANTED and Whitley's FTCA action is DENIED AND DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 1/30/12. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitley v. Sherrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major Boyd Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?