Berry v. Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc

Plaintiff: Rocky D Berry
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc
Case Number: 1:2011cv01611
Filed: September 6, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Winn
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING AND ORDER re 58 Joint MOTION for Hearing to Determine Need for Medicare Set Aside filed by Rocky D Berry, Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc. The Court finds that Medicare's interests have been adequately protected in this settlement within meaning of the Medicare Secondary Payer Statute and that, based on the evidence provided by the parties, no MSA is required in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 01/10/2015. (crt,Yocum, M)
March 31, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on March 31, 2014. (crt,Smilie, C)
January 9, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 17 Report and Recommendations by the magistrate judge in re: 7 Motion to Remand filed by Rocky D Berry. The Motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 01/06/2012. (crt,Leleux, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berry v. Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky D Berry
Represented By: Jimmy Wayne Wiley, Jr
Represented By: Bobby L Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc
Represented By: Mark N Bodin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?