Knoll et al v. Banner Life Insurance Co

Plaintiff: Tina Rabalais Knoll
Defendant: Banner Life Insurance Company
Counter_claimant: Banner Life Insurance Company
Counter_defendant: Tina Rabalais Knoll and Adrienne Theriot
Case Number: 1:2011cv01725
Filed: September 27, 2011
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Acadia
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 116 Motion Exercise Supplemental Jurisdiction to Resolve Fee Dispute Between Plaintiffs and Their Former Attorney and to Compel The Former Attorney to Immediately Pay to Plaintiffs the Undisputed Portion of the Insurance Proceeds Withdrawn From This Court and Presently Held in Trust and for ExParte Order. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 2/12/14. (crt,Kennedy, T) Modified on 2/13/2014 (Kennedy, T).
June 17, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 108 Motion for Writ of Supervisory and Motion to Stay Documents 84 and 103 . Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 06/17/2013. (crt,Yocum, M)
May 23, 2013 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 98 Motion for Suspensive Appeal, conditioned upon a supersedeas bond, as explained below, being filed with the Clerk of Court; granting 98 Motion to Expedite. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Theriot is to post a supersedeas bond in t he amount of the post-judgment interest on the judgment amount of $612,778.76, at the rate provided for by Title 28, United States Code, Section 1961, for one and one/half years with the Clerk of this Court. Signed by Judge Richard T Haik, Sr on 5/21/13. (crt,Kennedy, T)
April 4, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court REASONS FOR RULING in which the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Tina R. Knoll, individually and on behalf of her minor daughter. (crt,Brazell, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knoll et al v. Banner Life Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Banner Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer M Lawrence
Represented By: Virginia N Roddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Tina Rabalais Knoll
Represented By: Robert Allen Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Adrienne Theriot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Rabalais Knoll
Represented By: Robert Allen Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banner Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Virginia N Roddy
Represented By: Jennifer M Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?