Powell v. Avoyelles Correctional Center

Plaintiff: William Powell
Defendant: Warden Avoyelles Correctional Center
Case Number: 1:2012cv00296
Filed: January 26, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Avoyelles
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion for Certificate of Appealability re 31 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 08/12/13. (crt,Lundy, N)
July 15, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 26 Report and Recommendations, IT IS ORDERED that Powell's habeas petition is GRANTED, and Powell is GRANTED A CONDITIONAL WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, ordering his discharge from custody unless the State of Louisiana returns him to the Louisiana State Parole Board, East Baton Rouge Parish, Louisiana, for a new parole revocation hearing which comports fully with Powell's rights to minimal due process and to confront and cross-examine witnesses, within 60 days after the date of this Court's judgment. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 7/15/13. (crt,Guillot, M)
April 10, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The court finds that a discussion of these issues is important to the development of a complete record in the matter before us and a supplemental report and recommendation is warranted, although the undersigned expresses no opinion at this tim e as to whether any objections are of merit. Accordingly, this matter is hereby REFERRED to the magistrate judge for additional consideration in light of the objections, by both parties, to the previously issued report and recommendation. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 4/10/2013. (crt,Gregory, C)
September 17, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge James D Kirk on 9/17/2012. (crt,Haik, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Avoyelles Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Avoyelles Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?