Howell v. Town of Ball et al

Plaintiff: Thomas R Howell
Defendant: Town of Ball, Daniel Caldwell, Roger Toney, Curtis Robertson, Willie Bishop, Jerry Giddings, Chris Covington, Ginny Poteet and Roy E Hebron
Case Number: 1:2012cv00951
Filed: April 20, 2012
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Rapides
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2017 225 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 202 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/31/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
August 16, 2017 201 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 196 Motion in Limine. The proposed jury instructions submission deadline is EXTENDED to 8/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/16/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
March 3, 2015 149 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 128 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Daniel Caldwell, 104 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56 filed by Roy E Hebron, 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jerry Giddings, Willie Bishop, Chris Covington, Ginny Poteet, Roger Toney, Town of Ball, Curtis Robertson. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 3/3/15. (crt,Roaix, G)
October 9, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 136 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 10/09/2014. (crt,Yocum, M)
March 20, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Caldwell. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 3/20/14. (crt,Roaix, G)
December 21, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 48 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge, 32 MOTION to Dismiss Original and Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), 31 MOTION to Strike Penalty, Punitive or Exemplary Damages from Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, 45 MOTION for Reconsideration, 36 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 12/21/12. (crt,Burge, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell v. Town of Ball et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R Howell
Represented By: Daniel E Broussard, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Toney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Giddings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginny Poteet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy E Hebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?