Edwards v. Turner et al

Plaintiff: Gabriel Michael Edwards
Defendant: Darrell Turner, Donny Cartrette, Michael Melton, Kim Askcarlton, Unknown Medical Employees and Unknown Employees
Case Number: 1:2013cv02416
Filed: August 2, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in part 62 Report and Recommendations; granting 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claims by Plaintiff against Defendants Jones, Rhodes, Lawson and Watson for deliberate indifference to serious medical need are DENIED and DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 1/27/15. (crt,Bunting, M)
November 25, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision re 28 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 11/25/2014. (crt,Williams, L)
March 13, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 8 Report and Recommendations re 1 Complaint, as 7 Amended. Plaintiff's complaint be DENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A except (1) Plaintiff's excessive force and retaliation claims against Darrell Turner and (2) the medical care claim against Lt. Jones, Lt. Lawson, Counselor Watson, and Mrs. Rhodes. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 03/13/14. (crt,Guillot, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Michael Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Cartrette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Askcarlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Medical Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?