Aaron v. Keith et al

Plaintiff: Andrae D Aaron
Defendant: Tim Keith, Nicole Walker, Pollock, Medical Director Corrections Corp of America and Corrections Corp of America
Case Number: 1:2013cv02867
Filed: October 15, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Winn
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 80 Report and Recommendations; granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment, dismissing plaintiff's claims against all defendants. The pretrial conference scheduled for March 16, 2017 is CANCELLED. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 3/8/17. (crt,Roaix, G)
February 14, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 72 Motion to Supplement; granting 74 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/14/2017. (crt,Haik, K)
December 29, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion to Strike; granting 63 Motion to Strike. The Baton Rouge Advocate article entitled Reporter Exposes Flaws of Prison (Advocate article) (Docs. 57-2; 61-1) and any and all references to it from Plaintiffs Objections to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Docs. 57-1; 61) are hereby STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/29/2016. (crt,Haik, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron v. Keith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrae D Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Director Corrections Corp of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corp of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?