Tureau et al v. 2 H Inc

Plaintiff: Justin Dale Tureau, Kenneth James Guilbeau and Ritchie Grocer Co
Defendant: 2 H Inc, B O P C O L P, Hess Corp, B E P C O L P and Goldsberry Operating Co Inc
Case Number: 1:2013cv02969
Filed: October 31, 2013
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Avoyelles
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2016 157 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 138 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Chevron U S A Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 8/22/16. (crt,Roaix, G)
April 4, 2016 147 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED JUDGMENT. Amending this Court's prior Judgment 146 Adopting Report and Recommendation 131 issued 4/1/2016. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Defendant, Hess Corp's motion to dismiss 125 is GRANTED in part, such that Plaintiff's purported claims under La.Civ. C. Arts. 576, 577, 645, 2317 and 2322 are DENIED and DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Defendant'a motion is further GRANTED as to Plaint iff's purported claim under the post-amendment version of La. Civ. C. Art. 667 and such claim is DENIED and DISMISSED with prejudice. Defendant Hess Corp's motion is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 4/4/2016. (crt,Bunting, M)
April 1, 2016 146 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT adopting re 131 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 125 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Defendant Hess Corp's motion to dismiss, 125 is GRANTE D in part, such that Plaintiff's purported claims under La. Civ. C. Arts. 576, 577, 645, 2317 and 2322 and DENIED and DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's motion is further GRANTED as to Plaintiff's purported claim under the post-amendment version of La. Civ. C. Art. 667. Hess Corp's motion is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 4/1/2016. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 6, 2015 121 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING ; re 116 Report and Recommendations, granting in part and denying in part 104 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 104 Motion for More Definite Statement; adopting in part Report and Recommendations. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 8/6/15. (crt,Roaix, G)
July 31, 2015 119 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING adopting 116 Report and Recommendation. IT IS ORDERED that the 104 Motion for More Definite Statement is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 104 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Tureau is afforded leave to amend his complaint within 20 days of the adoption of this Report and Recommendation. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 7/31/15. (crt,DickersonSld, D)
April 2, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 94 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 4/2/15. (crt,Roaix, G)
September 30, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ORDERED that the claims asserted by each plaintiff in Civil Actions 13-2977 are to be severed as to each plaintiff and each plaintiff's claims shall be assigned a separate civil action number by the Clerk of Court. In so ruling, those portions of the motion filed by defendants BEPCO, BOPCO and Hess Corp. seeking to sever improperly joined parties are hereby granted. It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claims again defendants Goldsberry Operating Company, Inc. an d 2H, Inc. are DENIED AND DISMISSED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs' motions to remand are denied in all respects. It is further ORDERED that ll remaining motion pending in Civil Actions 13-2969 15 , 18 , 19 , 20 and 13-2977 (14,16, 18) are terminated. Any party wishing to refile any motion tailored to the particulars of an individual action may do so after the Clerk of Court assigns new civil action numbers to the newly-severed suits in keeping with our orders above. The Clerk shall designate the three new suits as RELATED matters. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 9/30/14. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tureau et al v. 2 H Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Dale Tureau
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: Jerold Edward Knoll
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Todd J Wimberley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth James Guilbeau
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: Jerold Edward Knoll
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Todd J Wimberley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ritchie Grocer Co
Represented By: Brian T Carmouche
Represented By: Donald T Carmouche
Represented By: John H Carmouche
Represented By: William Robert Coenen, III
Represented By: Ross J Donnes
Represented By: Jerold Edward Knoll
Represented By: Victor L Marcello
Represented By: D Adele Owen
Represented By: Todd J Wimberley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2 H Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B O P C O L P
Represented By: Aimee Williams Hebert
Represented By: Jane Allison Jackson
Represented By: Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Corp
Represented By: Joseph E Leblanc, Jr
Represented By: Kelly Elizabeth Ransom
Represented By: Elizabeth S Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B E P C O L P
Represented By: Aimee Williams Hebert
Represented By: Jane Allison Jackson
Represented By: Loulan Joseph Pitre, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldsberry Operating Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?