Moore v. Louisiana et al

Plaintiff: Krystal Thomas Moore
Defendant: State of Louisiana, Frank Pearce, III, Charles C Ugokwe and Pinecrest Support & Services Center
Case Number: 1:2014cv00398
Filed: February 14, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Rapides
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Presiding Judge: James T Trimble
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 18, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 3/18/2015. (crt,Bunting, M)
December 4, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: The court finds the Plaintiff's 32 Motion to Remand, or in the Alternative, Motion for Reconsideration or Motion for New Trial should be GRANTED, the court's prior Judgment will be partially vacated and all state law c laims in this case will be remanded to the 9th JDC, Rapides Parish. It is the conclusion of the court, while we do not lack jurisdiction to hear Plaintiff's pendent Louisiana law claims, the statutory and common law factors, as well as circuit j urisprudence, instruct this court should have remanded this case once it dismissed all federal law claims. While this court does not shy away from adjudicating matters, we believe this case fails to present exceptional circumstance which would justif y our retention of Plaintiff's pendent claims, making remand the appropriate remedy. Thus, we find Plaintiff has met the burden of proof required under FRCP 59(e). The court will issue an amended judgment in conformity with these findings. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 12/4/2014. (crt,Putch, A)
September 16, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Pinecrest Support & Services Center, State of Louisiana, Frank Pearce, III, Charles C Ugokwe. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 9/16/14. (crt,Bunting, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Louisiana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Christie Clark Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Pearce, III
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Christie Clark Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles C Ugokwe
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Christie Clark Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinecrest Support & Services Center
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Barbara Bell Melton
Represented By: Christie Clark Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Thomas Moore
Represented By: James B Doyle, Sr
Represented By: Jackey W South
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?