Black v. Jones et al

Plaintiff: Richard W Black
Defendant: Victor Jones, Dean Dove, Willie Clark and Natchitoches Parish Detention Center
Case Number: 1:2014cv00518
Filed: March 10, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Natchitoches
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2016 172 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 167 Report and Recommendations; granting 92 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and denying 123 Black's Motion for Summary Judgment; IT IS ORDERED that Black's action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 09/09/16. (crt,Tice, Y)
April 11, 2016 140 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 132 Emergency Motion for Medical Care. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/11/2016. (crt,Haik, K)
January 20, 2016 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 79 Motion Requesting Transfer to Red-River Parish Jail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 1/20/2016. (crt,Haik, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard W Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natchitoches Parish Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?