Young et al v. Waller et al

Plaintiff: Ervin Young and Ashley Dauzat
Defendant: Gregory Waller, Flames Logistics Inc, Murrays Trucking and Tower Insurance Co of New York
Case Number: 1:2014cv03030
Filed: October 15, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Avoyelles
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tower Insurance Co of New York, Flames Logistics Inc. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 10/19/2017. (crt,Roaix, G)
October 16, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Flames Logistics, Inc. filed by Tower Insurance Co of New York. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 10/16/15. (crt,Roaix, G)
April 21, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ; adopting Report and Recommendations re 12 , denying 9 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 5/21/15. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young et al v. Waller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin Young
Represented By: Benjamin David James
Represented By: Cory P Roy
Represented By: Brandon Jude Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Dauzat
Represented By: Benjamin David James
Represented By: Cory P Roy
Represented By: Brandon Jude Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flames Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murrays Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tower Insurance Co of New York
Represented By: Mitchell Hasenkampf
Represented By: Lance R Rydberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?