Saucier v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co

Plaintiff: Wilbert J Saucier, Jr
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co, GoAuto Insurance Co and Aleisha Tilly
Case Number: 1:2014cv03157
Filed: October 31, 2014
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Rapides
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2017 138 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING re 132 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by Wilbert J Saucier, Jr and 135 MOTION to Amend or Alter Judgment filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 4/17/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
April 6, 2017 131 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendants in the amount of $105,802.85, plus all taxable costs of court and post-judgment interest as allowed by law. Signed by Judge Robert G James on 4/6/2017. (crt,Crawford, A)
February 2, 2017 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 94 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 2/2/17. (crt,Roaix, G)
July 20, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 44 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co, State Farm Fire & Casualty Co. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 7/20/16. (crt,Roaix, G)
June 1, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 79 Motion for Attorney Fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before June 15, 2016, counsel for Defendant shall remit $1,225.00 to counsel for Plaintiff, representing attorney's fees incurred in preparing and prosecuting the Motion to Compel and the Motion to Fix. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 06/01/16. (crt,Tice, Y)
February 16, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 26 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Wilbert J Saucier, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 2/16/16. (crt,Roaix, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saucier v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Co
Represented By: Henry Gerard Terhoeve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoAuto Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aleisha Tilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert J Saucier, Jr
Represented By: Michael Lee Glass
Represented By: Lauren Saucier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?