Abshire v. Corrections Corp of America

Plaintiff: Clifford C Abshire, III
Defendant: Corrections Corp of America
Case Number: 1:2015cv02470
Filed: October 2, 2015
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Winn
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: James D Kirk
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING 10 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint is DENIED AND DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S. Section 1915 (e)(2)(B) and 1915A. The Clerk of Court is instructed to send a copy of this Judgment to the keeper of the three strikes list in Tyler, TX. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 04/01/16. (crt,Tice, Y)
March 15, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 17 Motion for Ruling to Enforce Terms of Settlement ; granting 20 REQUEST for Leave to Supplement Record: Rule to Enforce Terms of Settlement. (The supplement is already filed). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 3/15/2016. (crt,HaikSld, K)
February 2, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Stay; denying 12 Motion for Writ of Mandamus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 2/1/2016. (crt,Haik, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abshire v. Corrections Corp of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford C Abshire, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corp of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?