Williams v. State National Insurance Co et al

Plaintiff: Jacob Williams
Defendant: State National Insurance Co, Southern Tire Mart L L C, Timothy L Herrington and Robison Tire Co
Case Number: 1:2016cv01049
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Rapides
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 20, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 36 Report and Recommendations.; granting 16 Motion to Amend/Correct and remanding this case to the Ninth Judicial District Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Dee D Drell on 7/20/2017. (crt,Roaix, G)
June 14, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING - Diversity jurisdiction is established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/14/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
May 22, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW ORDER - Compliance Deadline set for 5/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/22/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
May 1, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/1/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. State National Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Williams
Represented By: William S Neblett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State National Insurance Co
Represented By: Andrew Brian Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Tire Mart L L C
Represented By: Andrew Brian Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy L Herrington
Represented By: Andrew Brian Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robison Tire Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?