Woods v. Fowner et al

Plaintiff: Carlos Woods
Defendant: Fowner and P Odhiambo
Case Number: 1:2016cv01097
Filed: July 25, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING Report and Recommendation filed in member case number 17-cv-0289. ORDERED that Wood's consolidated actions are hereby denied and dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to 28 U S C Section 1915A. The excessive force and due proc ess claims are dismissed with prejudice to be asserted again until the Heck conditions are met. The Clerk of Court is instructed to send a copy of the Judgment to the keeper of the three strikes listed in Tyler, Texas. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 5/4/2017. (crt,Bunting, M)
April 20, 2017 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 57 Motion to Remove Consolidation Order; denying 58 Motion for Restraining Order; denying 59 Motion to Correct Error in Report and Recommendation; denying 60 Motion to Release Documen tation; denying 64 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 65 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 66 Rule 34 Motion; denying 67 Rule 45 Motion; denying 68 Rule 65 Motion for Restraining Order; denying 69 Motion; denying 70 Motion f or Default Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that Woods' action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. rule 41(b), for failure to pay his filing fee or to submit a completed application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/20/2017. (crt,Haik, K)
January 12, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 15 Report and Recommendations. ORDERED that Wood's motion is denied and dismissed with prejudice as premature. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 1/11/2017. (crt,Bunting, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Fowner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fowner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Odhiambo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?