Melder v. Brittain et al

Plaintiff: Billy Melder
Defendant: Larry Brittain, Deem Structural Services L L C, American Alternative Insurance Corp and Shelter Mutual Insurance Co
Case Number: 1:2016cv01767
Filed: December 28, 2016
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Rapides
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING - Diversity still has not been shown. Compliance Deadline set for 6/9/2017 for Defendants to file a Supplemental Jurisdictional Memorandum setting forth the nature of the trusts and their citizenship. Second Compliance Deadline set for 6/16/2017 to allow Plaintiff to file a response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/26/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
May 25, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ***THIS DOCUMENT WAS FILED IN THE WRONG CASE***JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING - Diversity Jurisdiction is established. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove William Sartor's name from the docket sheet since it was included in error. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/25/2017. (crt,Tice, Y) Modified on 5/26/2017 to reflect that it was entered in the wrong case after speaking with the Law Clerk.(Tice, Y).
April 25, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 4/25/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melder v. Brittain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Melder
Represented By: Samuel James Spurgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Brittain
Represented By: David F Bienvenu
Represented By: Joshua Michael Hudson
Represented By: Allison Danielle Tassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deem Structural Services L L C
Represented By: David F Bienvenu
Represented By: Joshua Michael Hudson
Represented By: Allison Danielle Tassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Alternative Insurance Corp
Represented By: David F Bienvenu
Represented By: Joshua Michael Hudson
Represented By: Allison Danielle Tassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: S Aaron Siebeneicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?