Simon v. Gee et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Simon
Defendant: Rebekah Gee, Karen Medlock and Michelle Duncan
Case Number: 1:2017cv00237
Filed: February 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Calcasieu
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Presiding Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM RULING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 9/21/2018. (crt,Tice, Y)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 54 Report and Recommendations, denying as moot 34 Motion to Dismiss; denying 48 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying as moot 23 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 12/7/2017. (crt,Roaix, G)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 18 First Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint; denying 32 Second Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint; denying 35 Third Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint; denying 37 MOTION to Dismiss Subpoena Request for Medical Records; denying 39 Fourth Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint; denying 40 MOTION for Sanctions and MOTION to Strike; denying 43 MOTION for Sanctions and MOTION to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/7/2017. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon v. Gee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebekah Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Medlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?