Hudson v. Town of Woodworth et al

Plaintiff: Jeremy Hudson
Defendant: Town of Woodworth and Kyle McCain
Case Number: 1:2017cv00344
Filed: March 3, 2017
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Rapides
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/16/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
June 19, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING re 11 Report and Recommendations ; granting 7 Motion to Dismiss as laid out in this judgment. Signed by Judge James T Trimble, Jr on 6/19/2017. (crt,Roaix, G)
May 1, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER granting 7 Motion for More Definite Statement. Hudson is ORDERED TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 5/1/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson v. Town of Woodworth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hudson
Represented By: Christopher Jermaine Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Woodworth
Represented By: Jeremy Chase Cedars
Represented By: Randall B Keiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle McCain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?