Gilliam v. Outback Steakhouse of Florida L L C et al
Plaintiff: Ionia Moore Gilliam
Defendant: Outback Steakhouse of Florida L L C and Gallagher Bassett
Case Number: 1:2017cv00733
Filed: June 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Rapides
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Presiding Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING - Diversity jurisdiction is established. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 8/29/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SECOND JURISDICTIONAL BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 7/24/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUA SPONTE JURISDICTIONAL BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 6/14/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilliam v. Outback Steakhouse of Florida L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ionia Moore Gilliam
Represented By: Gloria A Angus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outback Steakhouse of Florida L L C
Represented By: Brian K Abels
Represented By: Rhonda Sansone Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallagher Bassett
Represented By: Brian K Abels
Represented By: Rhonda Sansone Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?