Douglas et al v. O'Neal et al

Plaintiff: Lonnie Douglas, Henry Douglas, MacArthur Douglas, Odessa Douglas, Viola Douglas, Antoinette Douglas and Lawrence Mathis
Defendant: Peter O'Neal, Michael Kramer, George Carroll, Toney Edwards, Sheriffs Dept Catahoula Parish, U S Dept of Agriculture and Sonny Perdue
Case Number: 1:2017cv00808
Filed: June 23, 2017
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Catahoula
Presiding Judge: Dee D Drell
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2018 121 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT adopting 117 Report and Recommendations, granting 62 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 5/29/2018. (crt,Roaix, G)
February 14, 2018 94 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT; adopting 86 Report and Recommendations, granting 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. IT IS ORDERED that the MTD 23 filed by the Catahoula Parish Sheriff's Department is GRANTED and Plaintiffs' claims against Catahoula Parish Sheriff's Department are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the MTD 13 filed b y Michael Kramer is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' claims against Michael Kramer under Louisiana law are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' remaining claims against Michael Kramer are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the M TD 24 file by Toney Edwards is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' claims against Toney Edwards under Louisiana Law are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs' remaining claims against Toney Edwards are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Dee D Drell on 2/12/2018. (crt,Tice, Y)
December 11, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 5 Motion for Judicial Sequestration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 12/11/2017. (crt,Tice, Y)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas et al v. O'Neal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MacArthur Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odessa Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viola Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoinette Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter O'Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kramer
Represented By: James H Gibson
Represented By: Alan W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toney Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriffs Dept Catahoula Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?